SMITH et al v. HULL et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Jose R Almonte |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-01099 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 5:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
MARY JONES 1-10
|
|
Defendant
KAREN MCGOWAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BARRY STUART LITWIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DANIEL LAMADRID
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN CAPELA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
|
|
Defendant
ETHAN ISAAC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT FREDERICK HULL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
IAN HELLER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARK EDWARD EHLE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CORY MONGNO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH ORENGO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRAVIS OLSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANGELA VAN DRUTEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN NANTES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MELISSA MUNZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN MORRIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASHLEY MONTES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW WARREN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CORTNIE TANGO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALEXIA MILONE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK METZINGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EDGAR MENDOZA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LISA WILEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KATE MCHALE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAMELA WYMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SABEEN AFZAL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NICOLE SCHROEDER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALISA STEWART
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LAUREN PACINI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PER STERNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VERONICA PALMISANO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRENNA PHELAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CANDACE PICZON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RYAN PUTMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NICOLE QUINLAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CRAIG SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CARMELLA ROMANIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES ROMERO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NIENU ROY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASHLEY RUPPEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JASON SAKOWSKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSICA SCHOENER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NICOLE CHMIELEWSKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LORAWN DUPREE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MELISSA DINAPOLI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER DIGIROLAMO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DONNA DALFONSO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENSINE MAY DELA CRUZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER COLLINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK COFONE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VINCENT CLEARY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALYSSA LONGO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COLLEEN CELMER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAWN CASALE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALEXANDRA CAPPELLO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VERONICA BECKETT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARIA BARRAZA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ISHITA AHMED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAMANTHA ACEVEDO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KELLY FITZGERALD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TANIJUA MALCOLM-SARGEANT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WALTER LINSLEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MELISSA LIBRANDI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
POLINA LEWKOWICZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN LAUTURNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KARTIK KOLLURI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HYUN KIM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LARRY KIKUCHI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHARON KEITH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VAIBHAV JAIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK JACOBSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KALEIGH HORDOF
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SONIA GARZA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHELSEA FLECKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
YESENIA FITZSIMMONS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER EHLERS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() LETTER ORDER granting the8 Letter, extending the stay in this matter until 7/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/20/2025. (wh) |
|
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Letter from Michael Westwood-Booth Esq. requesting the Court for extended Stay re7 Order, Order Staying Case.(WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Saturday, March 08, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() LETTER ORDER granting the6 Letter request to stay all deadlines in this matter for thirty days, until 4/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/7/2025. (wh) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Letter from Michael Westwood-Booth, Esq. requesting a Stay on all deadlines for 30 days.. (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH on behalf of JOHN CAPELA, MARK EDWARD EHLE, IAN HELLER, ROBERT FREDERICK HULL, ETHAN ISAAC, DANIEL LAMADRID, BARRY STUART LITWIN, KAREN MCGOWAN (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON REED SHER on behalf of JOHN CAPELA, MARK EDWARD EHLE, IAN HELLER, ROBERT FREDERICK HULL, ETHAN ISAAC, DANIEL LAMADRID, BARRY STUART LITWIN, KAREN MCGOWAN (SHER, BRANDON) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE SALWEN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SALWEN, JULIE) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN CAPELA, MARK EDWARD EHLE, IAN HELLER, ROBERT FREDERICK HULL, ETHAN ISAAC, DANIEL LAMADRID, BARRY STUART LITWIN, KAREN MCGOWAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh) |
|
qc
QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/11 9:22 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (wh) |
||
qc
QC - Fillable PDF
Tue 02/11 9:22 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 -2 Proposed Summons filed by DAVID HARRISON on 2/07/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh) |
||
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 02/10 9:00 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (mfr) |
||
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against JOHN CAPELA, MARK EDWARD EHLE, IAN HELLER, ROBERT FREDERICK HULL, ETHAN ISAAC, JOHN DOES 1-10, DANIEL LAMADRID, BARRY STUART LITWIN, MARY JONES 1-10, KAREN MCGOWAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16004757) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NICOLE QUINLAN, NICOLE CHMIELEWSKI, CHARLES ROMERO, LARRY KIKUCHI, JOHN NANTES, MARK COFONE, KATE MCHALE, JASON SAKOWSKI, TANIJUA MALCOLM-SARGEANT, ALYSSA LONGO, MARK JACOBSON, ANGELA VAN DRUTEN, CANDACE PICZON, KEVIN LAUTURNER, CRAIG SMITH, MELISSA MUNZ, NIENU ROY, DAWN CASALE, VERONICA PALMISANO, COLLEEN CELMER, MELISSA DINAPOLI, WALTER LINSLEY, RYAN PUTMAN, CHELSEA FLECKER, ASHLEY MONTES, SAMANTHA ACEVEDO, DONNA DALFONSO, ISHITA AHMED, ALEXANDRA CAPPELLO, BRENNA PHELAN, ANDREW WARREN, CORY MONGNO, TRAVIS OLSON, KELLY FITZGERALD, CARMELLA ROMANIA, ALISA STEWART, CORTNIE TANGO, KARTIK KOLLURI, JENNIFER COLLINS, JENNIFER DIGIROLAMO, MELISSA LIBRANDI, MARIA BARRAZA, MARK METZINGER, SABEEN AFZAL, HYUN KIM, ASHLEY RUPPEL, VINCENT CLEARY, LORAWN DUPREE, ALEXIA MILONE, LAUREN PACINI, SHARON KEITH, VAIBHAV JAIN, LISA WILEY, EDGAR MENDOZA, JOHN MORRIS, PAMELA WYMAN, JENNIFER EHLERS, KALEIGH HORDOF, YESENIA FITZSIMMONS, VERONICA BECKETT, JOSEPH ORENGO, POLINA LEWKOWICZ, JENSINE MAY DELA CRUZ, NICOLE SCHROEDER, PER STERNER, SONIA GARZA, JESSICA SCHOENER.(HARRISON, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |