Utah District Court
Judge:Howard C Nielson, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-00086
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fair Credit Reporting
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Case in other court:Third Judicial District Court Salt Lake County, 250900247
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 3:11 AM MDT
Defendant
TransUnion LLC
Represented By
Amanda Loughmiller
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan K Hawker
8928 S BLACK PINE ST
WEST JORDAN, UT 84088
Represented By
Matthew K. Broadbent
Vannova Legal
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
13 13 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Wed 04/02 10:38 AM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Scheduling Order: Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 5/30/2025. Discovery due by 11/19/2025. Motions due by 1/16/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 04/02/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 motion Scheduling Order Tue 04/01 4:16 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Bryan K Hawker. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Broadbent, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Planning Meeting Report,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order
11 11 misc Modification of Docket Tue 04/01 11:07 AM
Modification of Docket re10 MOTION for Scheduling Order : Pursuant to paragraph 3 of order5 , document is stricken as improperly filed. Document must be fashioned as a stipulated motion, with Attorney Planning Meeting Report and proposed order added as attachments. Per telephone conversation with counsel, the document will be refiled. (alf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
10 10 motion Scheduling Order Sun 03/30 3:54 PM
MOTION for Scheduling Order proposed filed by Plaintiff Bryan K Hawker. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Broadbent, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Planning Meeting Report stipulated
Monday, March 03, 2025
9 9 utility Reassignment to District Judge Mon 03/03 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-3 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/27 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Filing Motion to Consolidate Related Cases and Memorandum in Support by TransUnion LLC (Loughmiller, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, February 20, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/20 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K. Broadbent on behalf of Bryan K Hawker (Broadbent, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/14 7:17 AM
Defendant Trans Union LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by TransUnion LLC.(Loughmiller, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Mon 02/10 1:39 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 2/10/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Fri 02/07 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-3, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Bryan K Hawker, Defendant TransUnion LLC. Form due by 2/28/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Fri 02/07 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Bryan K Hawker, Defendant TransUnion LLC. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Fri 02/07 1:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant TransUnion LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., TransUnion, and other affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Loughmiller, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Atty) Fri 02/07 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 250900247, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5326794) filed by TransUnion LLC. (Loughmiller, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/07 1:42 PM
Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett added. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00086-JCB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]