California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-01072
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV07966
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Antara Chatterjee
Defendant
Genpact LLC
Represented By
Sabrina A Beldner
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Adam T. Simons
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Selwyn Chu
Mcguirewoods
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Tassy Rueweler
Represented By
Howard S. Rutten
Rutten Law Firm Apc
contact info
Guillermo Navarro Galindo
Rutten Law Firm Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 04/30 3:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Selwyn Chu counsel for Defendant Genpact LLC. Selwyn Chu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant GENPACT, LLC. (Chu, Selwyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/25 1:21 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of September 29, 2025; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of October 6, 2025; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for November 7, 2025, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of December 9, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 order Protective Order Tue 03/25 8:39 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court enters the following protective order: (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
21 21 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/25 8:45 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for March 31, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. The Court has entered a Protective Order in this action. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, this matter has been referred to private mediation. Final Pretrial Conference 11/07/25 at 1:30 p.m. Jury Trial 12/09/25 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Tue 03/25 8:40 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 13, 2025. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
17 17 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/21 11:38 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson. APPLICATION of Attorney Adam T. Simons to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Genpact LLC, designating Sabrina A. Beldner as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Adam T. Simons. (aco)
Related: [-]
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 03/20 2:47 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER ADVISEMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. A hearing on the MOTION to Remand Case11 is scheduled for March 24, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for March 24, 2025, is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 03/20 2:15 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam T. Simons to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Genpact LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39343688) filed by Defendant Genpact LLC. (Beldner, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 order Remand Case to State Court Tue 03/25 8:37 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for March 24, 2025 at 1:30 p.m., is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees. (See document for further details).; denying11 MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 03/17 5:53 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Tassy Rueweler.. (Rutten, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 03/10 4:01 PM
REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Plaintiff Tassy Rueweler. (Rutten, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
12 12 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/03 4:37 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Defendant Genpact LLC.(Beldner, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Simons
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 motion Remand Case to State Court Mon 02/24 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Tassy Rueweler. Motion set for hearing on 3/24/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Rutten, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Motion,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Motion,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Motion,
Att: 5 Declaration Declaration of Howard Rutten in Support of Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand and Request for Attorneys Fees in the Amount of $5,670 for Improper Removal,
Att: 6 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order Granting Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand,
Att: 7 Proof of Service
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 02/13 8:39 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for March 31, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 02/13 8:35 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
8 8 cs_rasgn Reassign Case (CV-81) Tue 02/11 5:13 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. (identical case) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Case number now reads as 2:25-cv-01072 PA(AGRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 02/10 11:53 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 02/10 11:52 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 02/10 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/07 1:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Genpact LLC identifying Genpact USA, Inc.; Genpact Limited as Corporate Parent. (Chu, Selwyn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/07 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Genpact LLC, identifying Genpact USA, Inc.; Genpact Limited. (Chu, Selwyn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/07 1:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Genpact LLC. (Chu, Selwyn)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/07 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV07966 Receipt No: ACACDC-39066125 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Genpact LLC. (Attorney Selwyn Chu added to party Genpact LLC(pty:dft))(Chu, Selwyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) Information Packet,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Notice of August 5, 2024 Case Management Conference,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Proof of Personal Service [of Summons as to Genpact LLC],
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Defendants' Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Certificate of Mailing for Court Order re Notice of Removal to Federal Court,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Court Order re Notice of Removal to Federal Court,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Notice of Remand from Federal Court,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Non-Appearance Case Review re Joint Stipulation and Protective Order,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Certificate of Mailing for Non-Appearance Case Review re Joint Stipulation and Protective Order,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - Notice of Appearance of Rachel Kermani for Defendant Genpact LLC,
Att: 15 Exhibit O - Application of Adam T. Simons to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice to Appear as Counsel for Defendant Genpact,
Att: 16 Exhibit P - Notice of November 6, 2024 Case Management Conference,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - Plaintiff's Case Management Statement,
Att: 18 Exhibit R - Plaintiff's Notice of Posting of Jury Fees,
Att: 19 Exhibit S - Defendant Genpact LLC's Case Management Statement filed October 22, 2024,
Att: 20 Exhibit T - Defendant Genpact LLC's Notice of Remote Appearance,
Att: 21 Exhibit U - Notice re Continuance of Hearing and Order,
Att: 22 Exhibit V - Minute Order re Application to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Case and Case Management Conference,
Att: 23 Exhibit W - Plaintiffs Notice of Court Order,
Att: 24 Exhibit X - Defendant Genpact LLC's Notice of Ruling re Motion of Adam T. Simons to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y - Defendant Genpact LLCs Case Management Statement filed February 4, 2025,
Att: 26 Exhibit Z - Plaintiff's Case Management Statement filed February 6, 2025,
Att: 27 Exhibit AA - Answer of Defendant Genpact LLC
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 02/10 11:40 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Tassy Rueweler in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/28/2024, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 02/10 11:47 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Genpact LLC, Antara Chatterjee in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/22/2024, attached as Exhibit AA. (jtil)
Related: [-]