Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Patricia L Dodge
Case #: 2:25-cv-00190
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
VIC BOVALINO
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P.
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P.
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P.
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P.
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P.
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P.
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P.
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
HERKY POLLOCK
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL HANLEY
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
GERALD DILEMBO
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC.
Represented By
Christopher J Azzara
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michael Baringhaus Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TIFANI DIAMOND
Represented By
Gary F. Lynch
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 05/06 8:23 AM
ORDER granting14 Joint Motion to Extend Case Deadlines. The deadlines established in the Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order are extended as follows: the parties shall conduct a Rule 26 conference by June 2, 2025; the parties shall file Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge/District Judge Option forms by June 5, 2025; the parties shall file a Rule 26 report by June 9, 2025; the parties shall file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process by June 12, 2025; and the Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference will be held on June 16, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. Parties will be directed to refer to the MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES for instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/6/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
14 14 motion Extend Time Mon 05/05 2:06 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to 06/02/2025 by B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC. (Mattingly, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 11:28 AM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 5/5/2025, Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/12/2025, Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 5/12/2025, and Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 5/8/2025. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Parties will be directed to refer to the MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES for instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 4/17/2025. (mqe)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice - Telephonic Conference (Microsoft Teams) Thu 04/17 11:25 AM
MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (mqe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 04/16 1:57 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC. (Azzara, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/15 4:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC. (Azzara, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 8:52 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Michael Mattingly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 3/5/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 03/04 3:46 PM
Errata re7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, of Michael Mattingly by B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC. Reason for Correction: Filed under Attorney Seeking Admission credentials. (Mattingly, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael Mattingly,
Att: 2 Proposed Order proposed Order
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Tue 03/04 10:49 AM
MOTION for attorney Michael Mattingly to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8732681) by B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Michael Mattingly,
Att: 2 Proposed Order (Azzara, Christopher) Modified text on 3/4/2025. (ert
misc QC - Motion to Appear PHV Tue 03/04 12:41 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,. ERROR: Filing attorney not the attorney requesting pro hac vice admission. CORRECTION: See LCvR 83.2(B) PRO HAC VICE ADMISSIONS. A motion for admission pro hac vice must be made by the attorney seeking to be admitted (using their own login info) and must be accompanied by an affidavit from the attorney seeking to be admitted pro hac vice. Attorney seeking admission is advised to sign and submit a new document using ERRATA event (so as to avoid repaying the filing fee), link filing to the previously filed motion and attach a proposed order. (ert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/21 5:01 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, HERKY POLLOCK, MICHAEL HANLEY, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., VIC BOVALINO, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., GERALD DILEMBO, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC Answer due from All Defendants. (Azzara, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Fri 02/21 4:57 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC. (Azzara, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Azzara on behalf of B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC. (Azzara, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
3 3 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Wed 02/19 11:22 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by TIFANI DIAMOND. B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; VIC BOVALINO served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; GERALD DILEMBO served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; MICHAEL HANLEY served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; HERKY POLLOCK served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025; SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (Lynch, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Management Group, L.P.,
Att: 2 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Hospitality Group, L.P.,
Att: 3 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants, LLC,
Att: 4 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants - Cranberry, LLC,
Att: 5 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants - McCandless, LLC,
Att: 6 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants - North Shore, LLC,
Att: 7 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants - Waterfront, LLC,
Att: 8 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants Group - Blue Spruce, L.P.,
Att: 9 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants Group - Cranberry, L.P.,
Att: 10 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants Group - McCandless, L.P.,
Att: 11 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants Group - North Shore, L.P.,
Att: 12 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants Group - Waterfront, L.P.,
Att: 13 Summons Returned Executed: Surefire Restaurants-Blue Spruce, LLC,
Att: 14 Summons Returned Executed: B-Lux Restaurants, Inc.,
Att: 15 Summons Returned Executed: Herky Pollock,
Att: 16 Summons Returned Executed: Michael Hanley,
Att: 17 Summons Returned Executed: Gerald Dilembo,
Att: 18 Summons Returned Executed: Vic Bovalino
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 8:58 AM
Summons Issued as to B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons,
Att: 10 Summons,
Att: 11 Summons,
Att: 12 Summons,
Att: 13 Summons,
Att: 14 Summons,
Att: 15 Summons,
Att: 16 Summons,
Att: 17 Summons,
Att: 18 Summons
Monday, February 10, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 02/10 4:27 PM
Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge added. (ert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 39 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Fri 02/07 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT against B-LUX RESTAURANTS, INC., VIC BOVALINO, GERALD DILEMBO, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MICHAEL HANLEY, HERKY POLLOCK, SUREFIRE HOSPITALITY GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT GROUP, L.P., SUREFIRE MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - BLUE SPRUCE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - CRANBERRY, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - MCCANDLESS, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - NORTH SHORE, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS - WATERFRONT, LLC, SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - BLUE SPRUCE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - CRANBERRY, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - MCCANDLESS, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - NORTH SHORE, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS GROUP - WATERFRONT, L.P., SUREFIRE RESTAURANTS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8691768), filed by TIFANI DIAMOND. (Lynch, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Consent to Sue,
Att: 3 Summons: Surefire Management, LLC,
Att: 4 Summons: Surefire Management Group, L.P.,
Att: 5 Summons: Surefire Hospitality Group, L.P.,
Att: 6 Summons: Surefire Restaurants - McCandless, LLC,
Att: 7 Summons: Surefire Restaurants - North Shore, LLC,
Att: 8 Summons: Surefire Restaurants - Waterfront, LLC,
Att: 9 Summons: Surefire Restaurants Group - Blue Spruce, L.P.,
Att: 10 Summons: Surefire Restaurants Group - Cranberry, L.P.,
Att: 11 Summons: Surefire Restaurants Group - McCandless, L.P.,
Att: 12 Summons: Surefire Restaurants Group - North Shore, L.P.,
Att: 13 Summons: Surefire Restaurants Group - Waterfront, L.P.,
Att: 14 Summons: Surefire Restaurants-Blue Spruce, LLC,
Att: 15 Summons: B-Lux Restaurants, Inc.,
Att: 16 Summons: Herky Pollock,
Att: 17 Summons: Michael Hanley,
Att: 18 Summons: Gerald Dilembo,
Att: 19 Summons: Vic Bovalino,
Att: 20 Summons: Surefire Restaurants, LLC,
Att: 21 Summons: Surefire Restaurants - Cranberry, LLC