California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:25-cv-00353
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:20 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Hemet
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Christy Gatewood
Represented By
Gregory Paul Peacock
Law Office Of Gregory Peacock
contact info
Jerry L Steering
Law Offices Of Jerry Steering
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
16 16 order Order Fri 05/09 10:48 AM
ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes, Granting Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline, (More than 30 days)15 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including July 7, 2025, to file an initial response to the complaint. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 05/06 10:15 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 7, 2025 filed by Defendant City of Hemet.(Attorney Andrea Katherine Kornblau added to party City of Hemet(pty:dft))(Kornblau, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 04/02 3:26 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Hemet answer now due 5/4/2025, filed by Defendant City of Hemet.(Attorney Khouloud Elmasri Pearson added to party City of Hemet(pty:dft))(Pearson, Khouloud)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 03/18 9:16 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/17 4:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christy Gatewood, upon Defendant City of Hemet served on 3/13/2025, answer due 4/3/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Peacock, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 02/10 4:07 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/10 2:10 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant City of Hemet. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 02/10 2:06 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 02/10 2:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 02/10 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
6 6 misc Declaration Fri 02/07 3:58 PM
DECLARATION of Christy Gatewood Re Successor in Interest filed by Plaintiff Christy Gatewood. (Peacock, Gregory)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 02/07 3:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Christy Gatewood. (Peacock, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/07 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christy Gatewood, identifying City of Hemet. (Peacock, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 trial Jury Demand Fri 02/07 3:55 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Christy Gatewood.. (Peacock, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/07 3:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christy Gatewood. (Peacock, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/07 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39068566 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Christy Gatewood. (Attorney Gregory Paul Peacock added to party Christy Gatewood(pty:pla))(Peacock, Gregory)
Related: [-]