Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tana Lin
Case #: 2:25-cv-00247
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Kloeckner Metals Corporation
Plaintiff
Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By
Russell J Reid
Reid Ballew & Leahy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/07 5:04 PM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) re6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Thu 03/06 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Russell
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
5 5 order TL Minute Order re Chambers Procedures Wed 02/12 11:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at[LINK:https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures] . All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
Related: [-]
4 4 order TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 02/12 11:19 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 02/10 8:55 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Kloeckner Metals Corporation (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 02/10 8:48 AM
Judge Tana Lin added. (HH)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 02/07 3:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Russell
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/07 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT To Compel Audit against defendant(s) Kloeckner Metals Corporation Related [+] Attorney Russell J Reid added to party Northwest Administrators Inc(pty:pla) filed by Northwest Administrators Inc.
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8832528id, Russell
Att: 1 Summons In a Civil Action,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet