California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:25-cv-00359
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Case in other court:Riverside Superior Court, CVRI2404498
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Hub Group, Inc.
Represented By
Emily R. White
Dinsmore And Shohl LLP
contact info
Kelsey Elizabeth Scherr
Dinsmore And Shohl LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Hub Group Dedicated, LLC
Represented By
Emily R. White
Dinsmore And Shohl LLP
contact info
Kelsey Elizabeth Scherr
Dinsmore And Shohl LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saul Fregoso
Represented By
Joseph Abraham Gross
Laurel Employment Law
contact info
Joshua Ittan White
Laurel Employment Law
contact info
Elizabeth Villarreal
Laurel Employment Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
24 24 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/14 8:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSING DOE DEFENDANTS. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
23 23 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Mon 05/12 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Michael Ludwig has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
22 22 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Fri 05/09 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for 9/2/25.(Villarreal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
21 21 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Fri 05/09 11:16 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Michael Ludwig may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 9/2/2025 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Saul Fregoso(Villarreal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 misc Statement Fri 04/25 2:42 PM
STATEMENT RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Plaintiff Saul Fregoso re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines16 . (Villarreal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
19 19 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Thu 04/24 5:03 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/24/2026. (iva)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 04/24 5:02 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2025. Motions due by 4/3/2026. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/24/2026. Motion set for hearing on 6/12/2026 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2026 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Jury Trial set for 7/13/2026 09:00 AM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/15 3:02 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on April 18, 2025 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/11 8:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DOE DEFENDANTS. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2025.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 03/25 11:25 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Saul Fregoso..(Villarreal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET
Monday, March 03, 2025
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 03/03 3:30 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2025 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 02/20 3:54 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 02/19 4:38 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Villarreal counsel for Plaintiff Saul Fregoso. Adding Elizabeth Villarreal as counsel of record for Plaintiff SAUL FREGOSO for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff SAUL FREGOSO. (Attorney Elizabeth Villarreal added to party Saul Fregoso(pty:pla))(Villarreal, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 02/12 5:30 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 02/12 5:30 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 02/12 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 02/11 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2404498 with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 02/07/2025, receipt number 39069804), filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc..(White, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 02/07 6:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)1 , Declaration,,3 , Notice (Other)2 , Declaration4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement6 served on February 7, 2025. (White, Emily)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/07 5:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc. identifying Hub Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (White, Emily)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/07 5:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc., identifying Hub Group, Inc.. (Attorney Emily R. White added to party Hub Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(White, Emily)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 02/07 5:34 PM
DECLARATION of William O'Hara re Notice (Other)2 filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc.. (White, Emily)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 02/07 5:31 PM
DECLARATION of Emily R. White re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)1 , Notice (Other)2 filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc..(White, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit N
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/07 5:27 PM
Notice filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc.. (White, Emily)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/07 5:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc.. (White, Emily)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 02/12 5:34 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Hub Group Dedicated, LLC, Hub Group, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Saul Fregoso. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/14/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO DECLARATION3 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 02/12 5:36 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Hub Group Dedicated, LLC. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/24/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO DECLARATION3 )(lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 02/12 5:38 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Hub Group, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO DECLARATION3 )(lh)
Related: [-]