New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Case #: 1:25-cv-01144
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 5:05 AM EDT
Amicus
State of Mississippi
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Alabama
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
Former Treasury Department Officials
Represented By
Gregory L. Diskant
Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Amicus
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue
Washington, D.C., DC 20002
Represented By
Alexander Zachary Lonstein
Lonstein Law Office, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
State of Arkansas
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Florida
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Georgia
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Idaho
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Indiana
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Iowa
Represented By
Eric H Wessan
Iowa Department Of Justice
contact info
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Kansas
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Louisiana
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Missouri
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Montana
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Nebraska
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of North Dakota
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Ohio
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Oklahoma
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of South Carolina
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of South Dakota
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Texas
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus
State of Utah
Represented By
David H Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Treasury
US Department of Treasury 1500 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20220
Represented By
Rebecca Sol Tinio
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
contact info
Defendant
Bessent Scott
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury U.S. Department of Treasury 1500 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20220
Represented By
Rebecca Sol Tinio
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
contact info
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Rebecca Sol Tinio
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
contact info
Intervenor
Judson Witham
Plaintiff
State of Maine
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By
Katherine Brady Dirks
Massachusetts Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State Of Connecticut
Attorney General of Connecticut 165 Capitol Ave
Hartford, CT 06106
Represented By
Matthew Fitzsimmons
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Arizona
Represented By
Joshua Bendor
Arizona Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joshua Katz
Arizona Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of California
Attorney General of California 1300 I Street Suite 125
Sacramento, CA 94244
Represented By
Mark Beckington
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Nicholas Reiss Green
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Thomas Stuart Patterson
Office Of The California Attorney General
contact info
Michael Surren Cohen
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
John D Echeverria
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Jay C Russell
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Colorado
Attorney General of Colorado 1300 Broadway
Denver, CO 80203
Represented By
Shannon Wells Stevenson
Colorado Department Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Delaware
Attorney General of Delaware 820 N. French Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Vanessa L Kassab
Delaware Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Hawaii
Represented By
Kalikoonalani Diara Fernandes
Department Of The Attorney General, State Of Hawaii
contact info
David Dana Day
State Of Hawaii - Department Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
Represented By
Darren Bernens Kinkead
Illinois Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin
Wisconsin Department of Justice Post Office Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707
Represented By
Brian Patrick Keenan
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
Office of the Maryland State Attorney General
Baltimore, MD 21202
Represented By
Adam Kirschner
Office Of The Attorney General- State Of Maryland
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
445 Minnesota Street Suite 900
St. Paul, MN 55101
Represented By
Elizabeth C Kramer
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Nevada
Represented By
Heidi Parry Stern
Nevada Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
Represented By
Kashif Taraq Chand
New Jersey Division Of Law
contact info
David Edward Leit
Division Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New York
Represented By
Andrew Stuart Amer
contact info
Colleen Kelly Faherty
contact info
Rabia Claire Muqaddam
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of North Carolina
Represented By
Daniel Paul Mosteller
North Carolina Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
Represented By
Elleanor H. Chin
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Rhode Island
Represented By
Alexander Michael Carnevale
Rhode Island Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Vermont
Represented By
Jonathan T Rose
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
149 149 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/12 3:37 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:148 Status Report filed by U.S. Department of Treasury, Donald J. Trump, Bessent Scott. ENDORSEMENT: The Amended Complaint shall be filed by May 23, 2025. Defendants are directed to inform the Court whether they intend to file a dispositive motion by May 30, 2025. The parties should meet and confer regarding a briefing schedule for such dispositive motion, and inform the Court of the parties' positions in the May 30 letter. The opposition to the Motion to Dissolve the PI Order will be due on May 14, 2025, and the reply will be due on May 21, 2025. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/23/2025., Replies due by 5/21/2025., Responses due by 5/14/2025) (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 5/12/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
148 148 misc Status Report Fri 05/09 5:51 PM
STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Document filed by Donald J. Trump, Bessent Scott, U.S. Department of Treasury..(Tinio, Rebecca)
Related: [-]