Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:24-cv-01576
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 5:04 AM EST
Defendant
JBW Group LLC
Defendant
Jonathan Stratton
Defendant
Stratton Design Build, LLC
Interested Party
United States of America
Represented By
John Eliot Beerbower
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Hilo Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Aspen M. Jensen
Sumsion Business Law
contact info
Nicholas John Gehrig
Bean, Kinney & Korman, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
50 50 respm Memorandum in Support Wed 05/07 6:43 PM
Memorandum in Support re49 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Amurietta Construction Services, LLC, Alberto Murietta. (Lonas, Carl)
Related: [-]
49 49 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/07 6:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amurietta Construction Services, LLC, Alberto Murietta.(Lonas, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
48 48 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Mon 05/05 5:54 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hilo Enterprises, LLC.(Gehrig, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of D Marquardt,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration
47 47 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 1:20 PM
ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Opposition to the Stratton Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt No. 36) is due on May 14, 2025 in re46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 5/5/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
46 46 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Sun 05/04 3:30 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hilo Enterprises, LLC.(Gehrig, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 01, 2025
45 45 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 05/01 10:39 AM
ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant JBW Group LLC shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. 16] no later than May 15, 2025 in re44 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 5/1/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
44 44 motion Extension of Wed 04/30 5:10 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by JBW Group LLC.(Poretz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order