Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:25-cv-00042
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 4:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Highland Cove Apartments, LLC
Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP 10001 Reunion Place, Union Square II, Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
Ryan Thomas Mery
Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP
contact info
Stephanie M. Krueger
Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P.
contact info
David W. Jewett
Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tremayne Slaughter
3501 West Waco Drive
Waco, TX 76710
Represented By
Michael A. Zimmerman
Zimmerman Zimmerman Cotner & Young, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
11 11 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/21 10:12 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Highland Cove Apartments, LLC, re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court 170th Judicial District Court of McLennan County, Texas filed by Plaintiff Tremayne Slaughter(Mery, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 motion Remand to State Court Fri 03/07 12:02 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court 170th Judicial District Court of McLennan County, Texas by Tremayne Slaughter.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Zimmerman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 03/05 4:49 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Highland Cove Apartments, LLC. (Mery, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/21 1:44 PM
ORDER CANCELLING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD IN PERSON. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (cav)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/20 1:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 11/19/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2026 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 2/2/2026 09:00AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Jury Trial set for 2/2/2026 before Judge Alan D Albright. Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2025. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (cav)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 02/19 8:37 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by Highland Cove Apartments, LLC. (Mery, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
5 5 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Tue 02/18 5:32 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 Report by Highland Cove Apartments, LLC. (Mery, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/14 4:06 PM
Defendant Highland Cove Apartments, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Highland Cove Apartments, LLC.(Mery, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 02/14 9:39 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD IN PERSON. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (cav)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
2 2 misc Supplement to Mon 02/10 11:11 AM
SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Highland Cove Apartments, LLC. (Jewett, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/07 7:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Highland Cove Apartments, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19769337), filed by Highland Cove Apartments, LLC.(Jewett, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet JS44-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B-2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B-3,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit B-4,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit F
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/11 11:49 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cap)
Related: [-]