New York Northern District Court
Case #: 8:25-cr-00014
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 08, 2025 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
Scott Davison (1)
Represented By
Michael P. McGeown-Walker
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Albany Office
contact info
Samuel C. Breslin
Breslin Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Justin Bennett
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/08/2025 3:22 AM EST
Friday, November 08, 2024
Text Minute Entry (FTR Recorded 8:33 a.m. - 8:43 a.m.) for proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro: Initial Appearance as to Scott Davison and Jonathan Popiel held on November 8, 2024. APP: AUSA Carling Dunham for Justin Bennett, for the Government. Defendants are advised that this matter is proceeding by video. No objections from counsel and defendants. Defendants advised of rights and maximum penalty stated. Defendants questioned regarding finances and are found eligible for court appointed attorneys. Office of the Federal Public Defender is appointed for one and a CJA for the other. Defendants advised of right to a Preliminary Hearing. Government seeks detention. Court orders defendants detained. A Detention Hearing is scheduled for November 12, 2024 at 8:45 a.m. by video for Scott Davison and November 12, 2024 at 9:00 A.M. by video for Jonathan Popiel in Plattsburgh before Judge Gary L. Favro. The Court issues the oral Rule 5(f) Reminder of Prosecutorial Obligation Order. Defendants REMANDED to custody of the U.S. Marshal. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER granting13 Letter Request as to Scott Davison (1): Detention Hearing reset for 11/19/2024 at 9:00 AM by video in Plattsburgh before Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 11/8/2024.(ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Scott Davison (1), Jonathan Popiel (2). (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Scott Davison: Michael P. McGeown-Walker appointed for Scott Davison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 11/8/2024. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Scott Davison: Detention Hearing set for 11/12/2024 at 8:45 AM by video in Plattsburgh before Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 11/8/2024. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Scott Davison, Jonathan Popiel: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 11/8/2024. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Scott Davison (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
11 11 PRETRIAL SERVICES INVESTIGATION REPORT - [LODGED] as to Scott Davison. [This document has been electronically lodged with the Court and is viewable by ONLY the attorney for the government, the attorney for the defendant, and the presiding judge. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited.] (sg3, ) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
13 13 Letter from Defense Counsel as to Scott Davison requesting 1-week Adjournment of Sentencing (McGeown-Walker, Michael) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
14 14 Letter from Defense Counsel Waiving Time Requirement of Preliminary Hearing as to Scott Davison (McGeown-Walker, Michael) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
ORDER granting16 Letter Request as to Scott Davison (1): Detention Hearing reset for 12/3/2024 at 8:30 AM by video in Plattsburgh before Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 11/18/2024.(ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
16 16 Letter from Defense Counsel as to Scott Davison requesting Additional One-Week Adjournment of Detention Hearing (McGeown-Walker, Michael) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Scott Davison. Attorney Michael P. McGeown-Walker terminated. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
19 19 CJA 20 - TEXT ORDER - Appointment of Attorney Samuel C. Breslin for Scott Davison. Refer to the Court's website: http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/criminal-justice-act for comprehensive information relating to court appointed representation. Attorneys are reminded that CJA vouchers are to be submitted to the court no later than 45 days after the final disposition of the case, unless good cause is shown. Please refer to Appendix II of the CJA Plan (Guidelines for Submitting Claims for Reimbursement Pursuant to the Criminal Justice Act of the Northern District of New York). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 11/20/2024. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
Text Minute Entry (FTR Recorded 8:32 a.m. - 8:34 a.m.) for proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro: Detention Hearing as to Scott Davison held on December 3, 2024. APP: AUSA Justin Bennett and USPO Bradford Hanley, for the Government, CJA Samuel Breslin, attorney for defendant. Defendant is advised that this matter is proceeding by video. No objections from counsel. Attorneys provided with copy of Pretrial Services Report. Defense indicates he was unable to access the Pretrial Services Report off CM/ECF and requests a brief adjournment. Court orders defendant detained and reschedules the detention hearing for December 5, 2024 at 9:15 a.m. by video. Defense waives the time limitations for the Preliminary Hearing but reserves the right to request one at a later date. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending his detention hearing. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearing as to Scott Davison: Detention Hearing reset for 12/5/2024 at 9:15 AM by video in Plattsburgh before Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
Text Minute Entry (FTR Recorded 9:21 a.m. - 9:23 a.m.) for proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro: Detention Hearing as to Scott Davison held on December 5, 2024. APP: AUSA Justin Bennett and SUSPO Jennifer Belli for Brad Hanley, for the Government, CJA Samuel Breslin, attorney for defendant. Defendant is advised that this matter is proceeding by video. No objections from counsel. Attorneys provided with copy of Pretrial Services Report. Defense waives the detention hearing today but reserves the right to request one at a future date should circumstances change. Court orders defendant detained. Defense continues to waive the time limitations for the Preliminary Hearing but reserves the right to request one at a later date. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending trial. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Scott Davison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 12/5/2024. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
21 21 STIPULATION by USA to 30 day exclusion of time for Scott Davison (Bennett, Justin) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Scott Davison: Time excluded from 12/5/2024 until 1/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 12/5/2024. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
25 25 STIPULATION by USA to 30 day exclusion of time (Bennett, Justin) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
26 26 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Scott Davison: Time excluded from 12/20/2024 until 1/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 12/20/2024. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
27 27 STIPULATION by USA to 30 day exclusion of time for Scott Davison (Bennett, Justin) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Scott Davison: Time excluded from 1/10/2025 until 2/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary L. Favro on 1/10/2025. (ds) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
Notice of Case Assignment - Waiver of Indictment: Case Caption: USA v. Davison; Case Number Assigned: 8:25-cr-14; Assigned Judge: Hon. Anne M. Nardacci; (tll) Modified on 1/21/2025 to show direct assignment due to co-defendant (tll). [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
TEXT NOTICE OF HEARING as to Scott Davison: Waiver of Indictment and Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/5/2025 at 11:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (dpk) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
TEXT NOTICE OF HEARING as to Scott Davison: The Waiver of Indictment and Plea Hearing is RESCHEDULED for 2/5/2025 at 10:00 AM in Albany, NY and is now before U.S. District Judge Anne M. Nardacci. (mab) [8:24-mj-00520-GLF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/5/2025 before U.S. District Judge Anne M. Nardacci: Waiver of Indictment and Plea Hearing. Appearances: AUSA Justin Bennett and Sam Breslin, Esq. (CJA). Defendant is sworn and questioned by the Court. Defendant acknowledges receipt of the Information. Defendant is advised of his rights, charges and potential penalties. Waiver of Indictment is signed by Defendant and his counsel. Based upon the statements made by Defendant and his counsel, the Court finds that Defendant's waiver of Indictment is knowing and voluntary and the waiver form is signed by the Court, accepted and entered into the record. Defendant enters a plea of guilty to Counts 1,2 and 3 of the Information. Government proffers the facts it would prove at trial. Government sets forth the stipulations as to the Plea Agreement on the record. Defendant confirms that he understands the Plea Agreement and has reviewed it with his counsel. The signed Plea Agreement is submitted and accepted. The Court further questions Defendant and his counsel. The Court is satisfied that the guilty plea is knowing and voluntary and that there is a basis and fact for the plea. Guilty plea is entered and accepted. The Court directs the U.S. Probation Office to prepare and submit a Presentence Investigation Report. Sentencing is set for 6/6/2025 at 1:30 PM. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USMS pending sentencing. (TIME: 10:07AM-10:31AM). (Court Reporter: Jacquelyn Gecewicz/CRD: Maria Blunt). (mab)
Related: [-]
29 29 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Scott Davison. (mab)
Related: [-]
30 30 FELONY INFORMATION as to Scott Davison (1), Count(s) 1, 2-3. (mab)
Related: [-]
32 32 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Scott Davison. (mab)
Related: [-]