California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00306
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 11:21 PM PST
Defendant
Joshua Aguilar Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Nancee S. Schwartz
Law Offices Of Nancee Schwartz
contact info
Material Witness
Jesus Hector Lim-Vazquez
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Marietta Irene Geckos
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/08/2025 12:27 AM PST
Monday, January 27, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT (t/w NTA) as to Joshua Aguilar (1).(bas1) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Defendant Joshua Aguilar. (bas1) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Order Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Material Witness Attorney Sandra Jones for Jesus Hector Lim-Vazquez appointed.Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Joshua Aguilar: Initial Appearance set for 1/27/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (gac) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
4 4 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Joshua Aguilar: Initial Appearance set for 1/27/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (gac) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
5 5 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Joshua Aguilar (fingerprint and release). Ordered by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/27/2025. (dls) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM read receipt
6 6 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Material Witness Jesus Hector Lim-Vazquez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/27/2025. (dls) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM read receipt
7 7 STIPULATION OF FACT AND JOINT MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) as to Joshua Aguilar and Order Thereon. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/27/2025. (yem) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Joshua Aguilar (True name: Joshua Aguilar Hernandez) held on 1/27/2025. Defendant present out of custody. Financial affidavit submitted/approved. Court confirms appointment of CJA Attorney Nancee Schwartz (present). Bond set as to Joshua Aguilar (1) $10,000 P/S secured by defendant's signature. Bond packet filed. Abstract - fingerprint and release - issued to USM. Defendant enters stipulation to release material witness; MW abstract issued to USM. The Court sets Arraignment/Change of Plea Hearing + Pretrial Diversion Hearing for 2/4/2025 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Rule 5f advisal provided; order to follow. (CD# 1/27/2025 DDL 206-217). (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Sommer, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Nancee Schwartz, CJA). (dls) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
9 9 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez (no document attached) (dls) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Joshua Aguilar Hernandez (1) $10,000P/Ssecured by defendant's signature. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/25/2025. (yem) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
11 11 P/S Bond Filed as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez in amount of $10,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/27/2025. (yem) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
12 12 STIPULATION OF FACT AND JOINT MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez and Order Thereon. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/27/2025. (yem) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joshua Aguilar Hernandez (yem) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/27/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Marietta Irene Geckos appearing for USA. NOA (Geckos, Marietta)Attorney Marietta Irene Geckos added to party USA(pty:pla) (yxc). [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez. Report prepared by: J. Almaraz Hernandez. (Document applicable to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez, USA.) (Almaraz Hernandez, J.) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Joshua Aguilar Hernandez. At the request of defense counsel, Arraignment, Change of Plea Hearing, and Pretrial Diversion Hearing reset for 2/6/2025 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (ecf) [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
18 18 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Geckos, Marietta) *QC mailer sent; document not signed. (axi). [3:25-mj-00383-DDL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
19 19 INFORMATION as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez (1) count(s) 1. (ecf)
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Arraignment on Information as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez (1) Count 1 held on 2/6/2025. Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Change of Plea Hearing as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez held on 2/6/2025. Plea Tendered by Joshua Aguilar Hernandez Guilty on counts 1 of the Information. Excludable(s) started as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez. PSR Waived. All pending motions withdrawn; Pending hearing dates vacated. Any objections to Findings due within 3 days. Pretrial Diversion Hearing - APS Diversion Program, as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez held on 2/6/2025. Defendant enters APS Diversion. Pretrial Diversion Hearing set for 2/26/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (CD# 2/6/2025 KSC 1055-1118). (Plaintiff Attorney Kaley Chan AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Nancee Schwartz CJA). (ecf)
Related: [-]
21 21 CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford by Joshua Aguilar Hernandez. (ecf)
Related: [-]
22 22 ALTERNATIVES TO PRISON SOLUTIONS PROGRAM AGREEMENT as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/6/2025. (ecf)
Related: [-]
23 23 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez (ecf)
Related: [-]
24 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge upon a Tendered Plea of Guilty as to Joshua Aguilar Hernandez: Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Defendant is to be admitted into the APS Diversion Program.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/6/2025. (ecf)
Related: [-]