Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Edward F Shea
Case #: 4:25-cv-05013
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405wc Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 motion Plaintiff's Opening Brief - Social Security Cases Only Mon 05/05 8:00 PM
Plaintiff's Opening Brief by Chelsea Bowen. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2025 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 order Order Mon 04/07 9:00 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Administrative Record was filed. The parties are to note their briefs for hearing, without oral argument, on August 29, 2025 . If the parties abide by the briefing deadlines set forth in Rules 6-8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions, the parties need not file a Motion for Stipulated Scheduling Order. Text-only entry - no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice on the matter by the Court. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (SG, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 misc Administrative Record - Social Security Cases Only Fri 04/04 12:45 PM
Administrative Record by Defendant Michelle King. (Edwards, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance - Commissioner Thu 02/27 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by L Jamala Edwards appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (Attorney L Jamala Edwards added to party Michelle King(pty:dft))(Edwards, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
2 2 notice Notice Re: Social Security 405(g) Cases Mon 02/10 8:43 AM
Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3: Service, the Court hereby notifies the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Washington of the commencement of this action by transmitting to them this docket entry via Notice of Electronic Filing. If Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and is not registered to receive electronic notice of filings, this Notice will be delivered to plaintiff via U.S. mail. Per Rule 3, "the plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4." TEXT ENTRY - No PDF Document. (LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 02/10 8:43 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/07 7:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Michelle King ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4730472) Filed by Chelsea Bowen.(Hatfield, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet