California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00120
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 08, 2025 11:35 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 (1)
Terminated: 01/10/2025


Docket last updated: 02/09/2025 1:42 AM PST
Friday, January 10, 2025
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Meta Platforms Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025. (dls)
Related: [-]