Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-02048
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 2:40 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alexandra Comolli
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Daniel Liburdi (1)
Terminated: 01/10/2025
Represented By
David Michael Kubiliun
Greenspoon Marder, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/13/2025 8:12 PM EDT
Thursday, January 09, 2025
Arrest of Daniel Liburdi (br)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
1 1 Magistrate Judge Removal of Indictment from Middle District of Florida; Case number in the other District 8:24cr564-KKM-TGW as to Daniel Liburdi (1). (br)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER Unsealing Case as to Daniel Liburdi. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (br)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Michael Kubiliun appearing for Daniel Liburdi (br)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Removal/Identity Hearing by Daniel Liburdi. (br)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Proceedings as to Daniel Liburdi held on 1/10/2025. Bond set: Daniel Liburdi (1) $100,000 PSB (stip). Deft waived removal hearing. (Digital 11:48:50) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/10/2025. (br)
Related: [-]
6 6 $100,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Daniel Liburdi Approved by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (br) (br).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/13/2025) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
7 7 ORDER OF REMOVAL ISSUED to the Middle District of Florida as to Daniel Liburdi. Closing Case for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (br)
Related: [-]