Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-30001
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Theodore Warren (2)
Represented By
Joseph P. Harty
Law Office Of Joseph P. Harty
contact info
Defendant
Lavante Wiggins (1)
Represented By
Matthew D. Thompson
Butters Brazilian LLP
contact info
Nikolas Andreopoulos
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Neil L. Desroches
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/09/2025 4:10 AM EST
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
Probable Cause Arrest of Lavante Wiggins, Theodore Warren. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Lavante Wiggins, Theodore Warren. Attorney Nikolas Andreopoulos for Defendant Wiggins and Attorney Joseph P. Harty for Defendant Warren. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Lavante Wiggins (1), Theodore Warren (2).(Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 JS45,
Att: 3 JS45
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson as to Lavante Wiggins. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson as to Theodore Warren. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Lavante Wiggins, Theodore Warren; Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
5 5 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Counsel (Attorneys Desroches, Andreopoulos, Harty), USPO Lavalley, and Defendants (UC) appear for Initial Appearance following probable cause arrest as to Lavante Wiggins, Theodore Warren held on 12/11/2024. Court advised Defendants of their rights. Defendant Wiggins has retained counsel. Defendant Warren petitions court for appointment of counsel and provides a financial affidavit for court consideration. Court appoints Attorney Harty to represent Defendant Warren. Government is not seeking detention. Colloquy re: proposed conditions of release. Court sets conditions of release for each Defendant and advises Defendants of sanctions of any violation of conditions of release. Defendants are released from custody. By December 17, 2024, counsel for Defendants shall inform the court whether they will be waiving preliminary hearings, or whether a preliminary hearing should be scheduled by the court. Court advised counsel for Brady obligations. Brady Order shall issue. (Attorneys present: Desroches, Andreopoulos, Harty. ) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please email the Court at [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact the Court by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
6 6 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Lavante Wiggins. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
7 7 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Theodore Warren. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
9 9 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5(f) entered as to Lavante Wiggins, Theodore Warren. (Healy, Bethaney) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nikolas Andreopoulos as to Lavante Wiggins. (Andreopoulos, Nikolas) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
11 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING on Defense Counsel's10 MOTION to Withdraw as to Lavante Wiggins ISSUED: An Ex Parte Motion Hearing is set for 12/18/2024 at 3:00 PM in Franklin Courtroom (IN PERSON) before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Rivera, Melissa) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Theodore Warren (Harty, Joseph) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
13 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Ex Parte Motion Hearing re Defense Counsel's10 MOTION to Withdraw as to Lavante Wiggins held on 12/18/2024. Present: AUSA Neil L. Desroches, Atty Nikolas Andreopoulos and Deft (OB). Brief colloquy held with counsel re why this matter was before the Court and upcoming deadlines. The Govt was excused. SEALED sidebar conference held with defense counsel and the defendant. Defense counsel's motion to withdraw was ALLOWED. Defendant informed the Court he expects to retain counsel within 2-4 days. He was instructed to inform successor counsel that a notice of appearance must be filed. Defendant is to discuss with counsel and notify the Court whether an extension to the deadline to hold a preliminary hearing will be requested. (Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please email the Court at [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact the Court by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Rivera, Melissa) [3:24-mj-03172-KAR]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
14 14 INDICTMENT as to Lavante Wiggins (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, Theodore Warren (2) count(s) 1, 2-5.(MPZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS45 Defendant Wiggins,
Att: 2 JS45 Defendant Warren
15 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Lavante Wiggins, Theodore Warren; Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (MPZ)
Related: [-]