Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:25-cv-20592
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2025
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC
Represented By
Bibiana Cristina Pesant
Lalchandani Simon Pl
contact info
Kabir Arjan Lalchandani
Lalchandani Simon, Pl
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Pagan
Represented By
Alberto R. Leal
Alberto R. Leal, Esq., P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 03/19 5:12 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/19/2025. See attached document for full details. (koy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Tue 03/18 7:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nicholas Pagan (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Administrative Order Tue 03/18 10:56 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (koy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Mon 03/17 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Nicholas Pagan (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 03/17 1:09 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING STATUS CONFERENCE Scheduled for March 17, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II on 3/17/2025. (gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 03/12 4:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file its response or answer on or before April 16, 2025 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/12/2025. (koy)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 03/12 1:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC.(Pesant, Bibiana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 order Order Setting Status Conference Wed 03/12 12:03 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER setting telephonic status conference for March 17, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are instructed to call 833 568 8864 (US Toll-free) by no later than 1:25 p.m. on March 17, 2025. The meeting ID is 160 623 6605 and the passcode is 304850. The Court requires that the parties appear via a landline (i.e., not a cellular phone or a speaker phone), if possible, for clarity. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/12/2025. (koy)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/12 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kabir Arjan Lalchandani on behalf of MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC. Attorney Kabir Arjan Lalchandani added to party MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC(pty:dft). (Lalchandani, Kabir)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/12 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bibiana Cristina Pesant on behalf of MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC. Attorney Bibiana Cristina Pesant added to party MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC(pty:dft). (Pesant, Bibiana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 02/26 11:29 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nicholas Pagan. MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC served on 2/24/2025, response/answer due 3/17/2025. (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 misc Affidavit Wed 02/12 9:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT regarding previous use of website signed by: Nicholas Pagan by Nicholas Pagan (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 respm Response/Reply (Other) Tue 02/11 4:50 PM
First RESPONSE to order requiring Verified Certificate of Counsel by Nicholas Pagan. (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order of Requirements Tue 02/11 3:48 PM
ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT REGARDING VISITS TO PROPERTY AND USE OF WEBSITE. Statement of Claim due by 2/25/2025. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/11/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 02/10 9:49 AM
Summons Issued as to MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC. (cwc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 09, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 02/10 9:46 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 02/09 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT against MIAMI PERFECT SMILE LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number BFLSDC-18190286, filed by Nicholas Pagan.(Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet