New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Case #: 1:25-cv-00728
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2025
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Pam Bondi
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Defendant
Kika Scott
Defendant
Michael Valverde
Plaintiff
Yongle Lin
Represented By
Sam Faez Haddad
Law Office Of Sam F. Haddad, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/11 11:15 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Pam Bondi, Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, Michael Valverde (Cooper, David)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 04/11 11:27 AM
Civil Case Terminated as per Stipulation of Dismissal. (PW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
9 9 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 04/04 10:39 AM
FILING FEE: $ 150.00, receipt number 100020111. re: sanctions pd by Sam Faez Haddad, Esq.. (RG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 misc Letter Tue 04/01 6:28 PM
Letter Documenting Payment Sent to Court by Yongle Lin (Haddad, Sam)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 04/01 5:08 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference in light of the fact that the Government was only served with copies of the Summons and Complaint in this action today, April 1, 2025, along with a status update to the Court by Pam Bondi, Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, Michael Valverde. (Cooper, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Cooper on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, David)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 04/01 6:16 PM
ORDER granting in part7 . Initial Status Conference adjourned to 4/25/2025 at 11:30 AM and the Government is reminded to file a status update no later than 24 hours prior to the adjourned date. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 followed by Meeting ID: 949146687#. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/1/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 03/25 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for Initial Status Conference and Order Imposing Sanctions. Counsel for plaintiff did not appear and is therefore sanctioned pursuant to Rule 16(f) in the amount of $150, payable to the Clerk of Court within 7 days with proof of payment filed on the docket. The conference is reset to 4/2/2025 at 11:30 am and the Government is directed to file a status update no later than 24 hours prior to the adjourned date. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 followed by Meeting ID: 949146687#. (PW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 02/18 8:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Pam Bondi, Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, Michael Valverde, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/17 3:01 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Yongle Lin (Haddad, Sam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 16, 2025
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Sun 02/16 4:17 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Yongle Lin (Haddad, Sam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 02/11 9:43 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/11 9:40 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Tue 02/11 9:44 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The rider should not be filed as a separate attachment to the complaint. It should be filed as an additional page to the proposed summons. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Tue 02/11 3:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Honorable Brian M. Cogan for a telephonic Initial Status Conference on 3/25/2025 at 10:00 am. The parties are directed to call toll free number 571-353-2301 followed by Meeting ID: 949146687#. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to notify all attorneys in this action of the conference schedule in writing. No later than 24 hours prior to the Initial Status Conference, the Government must file a brief letter advising the Court whether the status of the case has changed since the filing of the complaint. Counsel is directed to review Judge Cogan's Individual Practices, which may be obtained on the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/content/judge-brian-m-cogan. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Cogan's Rules. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/11/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/10 11:32 AM
Notice: Re: Incomplete Disclosure Statement Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. If this does not apply write reason or none in this section. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 09, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 02/09 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Pam Bondi, Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, Michael Valverde filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18747143 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yongle Lin. (Haddad, Sam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet