New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:25-cv-00725
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Hamza & Madina Corp.
Defendant
Hamza Mashriqi
Defendant
Kasam Mashriqi
Defendant
Mohammad Mashriqi
Defendant
Salem Mashriqi
Plaintiff
Emre Gokcek
Represented By
Keith E. Williams
The Nhg Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tahir Gokcek
Represented By
Keith E. Williams
The Nhg Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Umut Gokcek
Represented By
Keith E. Williams
The Nhg Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 8:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Srdjan Milenkovic on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Milenkovic, Srdjan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/14 11:50 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: The IN-PERSON Initial Conference set for 6/23/25 has been ADVANCED to 6/9/2025 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Counsel are reminded to comply with Docket Entry11 prior to the initial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. (JT)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/11 12:44 PM
ORDER: An IN-PERSON Initial Conference is set for 6/23/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/11/2025. (JT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AYS RULES
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/09 9:49 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Hamza & Madina Corp., Hamza Mashriqi, Kasam Mashriqi, Mohammad Mashriqi, Salem Mashriqi. (Ayers, Lila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/19 2:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Umut Gokcek, Tahir Gokcek, Emre Gokcek. Mohammad Mashriqi served on 3/15/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/19 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Umut Gokcek, Tahir Gokcek, Emre Gokcek. Kasam Mashriqi served on 3/15/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/19 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Umut Gokcek, Tahir Gokcek, Emre Gokcek. Salem Mashriqi served on 3/15/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/19 2:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Umut Gokcek, Tahir Gokcek, Emre Gokcek. Hamza Mashriqi served on 3/15/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/19 2:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Umut Gokcek, Tahir Gokcek, Emre Gokcek. Hamza & Madina Corp. served on 2/14/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 02/10 10:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Hamza & Madina Corp., Hamza Mashriqi, Kasam Mashriqi, Mohammad Mashriqi, Salem Mashriqi. (SMF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 02/10 9:43 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SMF)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 02/10 9:41 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/10 9:42 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Mon 02/10 11:00 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information.Docket 4 reentered. Summons reissued do to clerical error. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2025
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 02/08 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Hamza & Madina Corp., Hamza Mashriqi, Kasam Mashriqi, Mohammad Mashriqi, Salem Mashriqi filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18746981 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Umut Gokcek, Tahir Gokcek, Emre Gokcek. (Williams, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet