Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:25-bk-10211
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Omega Therapeutics, Inc.
140 First Street Suite 501
Cambridge, MA 02141
Represented By
Luke Brzozowski
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Jonathan Michael Weyand
Morris, Nichols, Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Daniel B. Butz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Echo Yi Qian
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 7:26 PM EDT
Attorney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
1201 North Market Street P.O. Box 1347
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Echo Yi Qian
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Claims Agent
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
www.kroll.com/kra 1 World Trade Center 31st Floor
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
contact info
Cred. Comm. Chair
Joseph Newman
Cred. Comm. Chair
John Graeme Hodgson
Cred. Comm. Chair
JMS Advisors, Inc.
1572 Granger Way
Redwood, CA 94061
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, a Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson, Esq. 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
James E. Huggett
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Creditor
Banc of California
Represented By
Richard M. Pachulski
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kornfeld
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tempus AI, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Katherine M. Devanney
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Creditor
Thermo Fisher Scientific
Represented By
Adam Hiller
Hiller Law, LLC
contact info
Beverly Weiss Manne
Tucker Arensberg, P.C.
contact info
Maribeth Thomas
Tucker Arensberg
contact info
Creditor Committee
Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Justin R. Alberto
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Elazar A. Kosman
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
H. C. Jones, III
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
H. C. Jones
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Andrew L. Cole
Cole Schotz, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Pioneering Medicines 08-B, Inc.
Represented By
L. Katherine Good
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Ethan H. Sulik
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Kizzy Lyn Jarashow
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
James Lathrop
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Barry Z Bazian
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Stacy Dasaro
Goodwin Proctor LLP
contact info
James R. Risener, III
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Interested Party
ARE-MA Region No. 94, LLC
Represented By
Matthew R Pierce
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
234 234 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 05/09 7:01 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Christine Porter Regarding Bar Date Notice, and Proof of Claim Form . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 207
233 233 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 05/09 4:37 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Eladio Perez Regarding Order (I) Approving the Sale of Substantially all of the Debtors Assets Free and Clear of Claims, Liens, and Encumbrances; (II) Approving the Amended and Restated Asset Purchase Agreement; (III) Approving the Assumption and Assignment of Designated Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases; and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 205
232 232 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 05/09 3:53 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Engels Medina Regarding Notice of Filing of Revised Stalking Horse APA, Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Order (I) Approving the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtors Assets Free and Clear of Claims, Liens, and Encumbrances; (II) Approving the Asset Purchase Agreement; (III) Approving the Assumption and Assignment of Designated Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases; and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief, Order (I) Establishing Certain Bar Dates for Filing Prepetition Claims and Administrative Expense Claims, and (II) Granting Related Relief, Including Notice and Filing Procedures, Amended Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for April 23, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. (prevailing Eastern Time), and Verified Statement of Hogan Lovells US LLP Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2014 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 199 ,200 ,201 ,202 ,203
231 231 motion Extend - Motion Fri 05/09 2:27 PM
Motion to Extend // Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Debtor's Time to File Notices of Removal of Claims and Causes of Action Related to the Debtor's Chapter 11 Case Filed by OMGA Liquidating, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2025 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/23/2025. (Qian, Echo Yi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Proposed Order
230 230 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 05/09 1:15 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ishrat Khan Regarding Second Monthly Fee Application of Triple P RTS, LLC, as Restructuring Advisor for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, for Allowance of Monthly Compensation and for Reimbursement of All Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred for the Period March 01, 2025 through and Including March 31, 2025 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 197
229 229 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 05/09 12:46 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Third Supplemental Notice of (I) Possible Treatment of Contracts and Leases, (II) Fixing of Cure Amounts, and (III) Deadline to Object Thereto . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 194
Thursday, May 08, 2025
228 228 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Thu 05/08 1:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Second Monthly Fee Application of Triple P RTS, LLC, as Restructuring Advisor for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, for Allowance of Monthly Compensation and for Reimbursement of All Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred for the Period March 1, 2025 Through March 31, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Triple P RTS, LLC. (Qian, Echo Yi)
Related: [-] 197
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
227 227 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 05/07 2:16 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by OMGA Liquidating, Inc.. (Qian, Echo Yi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Omnibus Hearing Order
226 226 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 11:30 AM
Order Authorizing Changing the Caption of the Debtors Case Related [+] Order Signed on 5/7/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 225
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
225 225 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Tue 05/06 7:56 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order, Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 1005 and 2002, And Del. Bankr. L.R. 9004-1, Authorizing Changing the Caption of the Debtors Case Related [+]. Filed by Omega Therapeutics, Inc.. (Qian, Echo Yi)
Related: [-] 205 205
Att: 1 Exhibit A
224 224 claims Certificate of Mailing Tue 05/06 1:38 PM
Certificate of Mailing . Filed by Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 223
223 223 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Tue 05/06 12:46 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation / First Monthly Fee Application of Cole Schotz P.C., Counsel to the Committee, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period February 21, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit (s) A - C
Monday, May 05, 2025
222 222 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 05/05 3:53 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Eladio Perez Regarding Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for April 23, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. (prevailing Eastern Time) . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 193
Friday, May 02, 2025
221 221 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 05/02 11:52 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ishrat Khan Regarding Notice of Cancellation of Auction and Designation of Successful Bidder, and First Monthly Fee Application of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, for Allowance of Monthly Compensation and for Reimbursement of All Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred for the Period February 10, 2025 through and Including February 28, 2025 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 161 ,162