New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: J Brendan Day
Case #: 3:25-cv-01119
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:33 AM EDT
Defendant
JAMES MAY
Represented By
MACK PRESS
Securities Arbitration Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
ABBA KADER
Represented By
MACK PRESS
Securities Arbitration Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
ANTHONY MUSTO
Represented By
MACK PRESS
Securities Arbitration Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
STANLEY GRUBER
Represented By
MACK PRESS
Securities Arbitration Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
JONATHAN CIANGIULLI
Represented By
MACK PRESS
Securities Arbitration Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
CORY TEREICK
Represented By
MACK PRESS
Securities Arbitration Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
PATRICIA THOMAS
Represented By
MACK PRESS
Securities Arbitration Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER PALERMO
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KURT PADAVANO
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREA WHITE
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL LAW
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FRED BATTISTI, JR.
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREA BOITNOTT
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SAM COLLIER
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BILL COMEAU
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW DENARDO
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JARED FELDMAN
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY GROSSO
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HAZINSKI
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
41 41 misc Letter Mon 05/12 4:25 PM
Letter from Omar A. Bareentto to The Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re40 Brief in Opposition to Motion,25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation . (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
40 40 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 12:49 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation ,24 MOTION to Seal ,2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/15 10:27 AM
Set Deadlines as to35 Second MOTION to Expedite Proposed Order for Second Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration ,37 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation, and extending the return date . Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
39 39 misc Letter Mon 04/14 5:57 PM
Letter from Omar A. Bareentto to The Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re37 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation, and extending the return date ,36 Letter,35 Second MOTION to Expedite Proposed Order for Second Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration ,38 Letter,.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
38 38 misc Letter Mon 04/14 2:13 PM
Letter from Mack Press, Esq. re37 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation, and extending the return date ,36 Letter,35 Second MOTION to Expedite Proposed Order for Second Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration . (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/14 1:58 PM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation, and extending the return date by All Defendants. (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Letter Mon 04/14 1:41 PM
Letter from Mack Press, Esq. re35 Second MOTION to Expedite Proposed Order for Second Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration . (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Expedite Mon 04/14 1:25 PM
Second MOTION to Expedite Proposed Order for Second Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration by All Defendants.(PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Second Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Expedited Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond To Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Arbitration
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 10:17 AM
ORDER that the Motion extending until 4/14/2025 the date by which Defendants must oppose Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation, and extending the return date to 5/1/2025 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/4/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
33 33 misc Letter Tue 04/08 9:24 PM
Letter from Brian W. Carroll to The Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation , Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (CARROLL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/20 11:19 AM
Reset Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation . Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
32 32 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Wed 03/19 11:13 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation ,2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order 3. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/17 9:53 AM
Set Deadlines as to31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation, and extending the return date until May 1, 2025 for Plaintiffs' pending Motions before the Court . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 03/14 2:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation, and extending the return date until May 1, 2025 for Plaintiffs' pending Motions before the Court by JONATHAN CIANGIULLI, STANLEY GRUBER, ABBA KADER, JAMES MAY, ANTHONY MUSTO, CORY TEREICK, PATRICIA THOMAS.(PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion for An Extension of Time and To Reset The Return Date For Plaintiffs' Instant Motions,
Att: 2 Proposed Order for An Extension of Time and To Reset The Return Date For Plaintiffs' Instant Motions
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
30 30 misc Letter Wed 03/12 7:28 PM
Letter from Omar A. Bareentto to The Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re28 Letter,. (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 7:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN WILLIAM CARROLL on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CARROLL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Mon 03/10 10:36 PM
Letter from from Mack Press, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Shipp re14 Response in Opposition to Motion,25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation ,4 Declaration,,,,,7 Declaration,,,,,,,,21 Declaration,,,,24 MOTION to Seal ,6 Certification,,,,,22 Declaration,,,,,,3 Brief,,23 Certification,,,,5 Declaration,,,,,,2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,20 Brief. (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
27 27 3 pgs misc Letter Fri 03/07 5:06 PM
Letter from Mack Press, Esq. re26 Letter. (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs misc Letter Fri 03/07 2:10 PM
Letter from Omar A. Bareentto to The Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation ,2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Thursday, March 06, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/06 11:22 AM
Set Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 motion Compel Arbitration Wed 03/05 3:17 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Stay Litigation by FRED BATTISTI, JR., BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA BOITNOTT, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SAM COLLIER, BILL COMEAU, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREW DENARDO, JARED FELDMAN, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, ANTHONY GROSSO, MICHAEL HAZINSKI, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MICHAEL LAW, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, KURT PADAVANO, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA WHITE.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification Omar A. Bareentto,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 28, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/28 12:35 PM
Set Deadlines as to24 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
24 24 motion Seal Thu 02/27 5:44 PM
MOTION to Seal by FRED BATTISTI, JR., BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA BOITNOTT, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SAM COLLIER, BILL COMEAU, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREW DENARDO, JARED FELDMAN, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, ANTHONY GROSSO, MICHAEL HAZINSKI, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MICHAEL LAW, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, KURT PADAVANO, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA WHITE.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement,
Att: 2 Declaration of Andrew DeNardo,
Att: 3 Index,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
23 23 misc Certification Thu 02/27 5:33 PM
Certification of Omar A. Bareentto on behalf of FRED BATTISTI, JR., BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA BOITNOTT, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SAM COLLIER, BILL COMEAU, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREW DENARDO, JARED FELDMAN, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, ANTHONY GROSSO, MICHAEL HAZINSKI, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MICHAEL LAW, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, KURT PADAVANO, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA WHITE Re6 Certification,,,,,.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
22 22 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 5:22 PM
DECLARATION of Andrew DeNardo re7 Declaration,,,,,,,, by FRED BATTISTI, JR., BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA BOITNOTT, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SAM COLLIER, BILL COMEAU, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREW DENARDO, JARED FELDMAN, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, ANTHONY GROSSO, MICHAEL HAZINSKI, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MICHAEL LAW, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, KURT PADAVANO, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA WHITE.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33,
Att: 34 Exhibit 34
21 21 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 5:09 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher Palermo re4 Declaration,,,,,5 Declaration,,,,,, by FRED BATTISTI, JR., BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA BOITNOTT, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SAM COLLIER, BILL COMEAU, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREW DENARDO, JARED FELDMAN, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, ANTHONY GROSSO, MICHAEL HAZINSKI, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MICHAEL LAW, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, KURT PADAVANO, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA WHITE.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
20 20 respoth Brief Thu 02/27 5:06 PM
BRIEF In Support of Order To Show Cause For Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraints (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
18 18 misc Letter Thu 02/20 1:35 PM
Letter re16 Order to Show Cause,17 Letter. (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Letter Thu 02/20 9:51 AM
Letter from Omar A. Bareentto to The Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re16 Order to Show Cause. (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 02/18 11:41 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiff's must show cause by e-filed submission as to why this Court has subject matter jurisdiction by 2/21/2025. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/18/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
19 19 minutes Motion Hearing Sun 02/23 3:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2025 re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, ANTHONY GROSSO, FRED BATTISTI, JR., BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, KURT PADAVANO, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SAM COLLIER, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA BOITNOTT, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, JARED FELDMAN, BILL COMEAU, ANDREA WHITE, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, MICHAEL HAZINSKI, ANDREW DENARDO, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MICHAEL LAW, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, Shannan Gagliardi (609-815-2750)) (jab)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certification Thu 02/13 2:10 PM
Certification on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Stanley Gruber,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Cory Tereick
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/13 9:36 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JAMES MAY, ANTHONY MUSTO, PATRICIA THOMAS, JONATHAN CIANGIULLI, ABBA KADER, CORY TEREICK, STANLEY GRUBER re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - Dr. Craig McCann, SLCG Economic Consulting: First Realty Partners Reg D Offerings: Muppets Do Commercial Real Estate,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - Curriculum Vitae of Dr. McCann
13 13 misc Letter Thu 02/13 9:32 AM
Letter from Mack Press, Esq. re1 Complaint,,,,3 Brief,,2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Thu 02/13 8:42 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The10 Motion to Compel filed by Mack Press on 2/12/2025 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerk's office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT USING EVENT *RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Thu 02/13 8:43 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mack Press on 2/12/2025 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerk's office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing and d.e.11 . PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT USING EVENT *Letter*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 02/12 11:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and TRO - (CORRECTED) Letter to Judge Michael A. Shipp dated 02/12/2025 by JAMES MAY, ANTHONY MUSTO, PATRICIA THOMAS, JONATHAN CIANGIULLI, ABBA KADER, CORY TEREICK, STANLEY GRUBER. Responses due by 2/13/2025. (PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 02/12 10:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and instant TRO as Moot, Frivolous, and Not Ripe by JAMES MAY, ANTHONY MUSTO, PATRICIA THOMAS, JONATHAN CIANGIULLI, ABBA KADER, CORY TEREICK, STANLEY GRUBER. Responses due by 2/13/2025.(PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Objection Letters CORRECTED Overview of Investor-Defendants' Opposition to Plaintifs' Motion for a TRO, and to dismiss the Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - Dr. McCann Article,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 -Curriculum Vitae of Dr. McCann
10 10 motion Compel Arbitration Wed 02/12 5:40 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration OVERVIEW OF OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFFS-HERE, for 2/13/25 Call with the Court by JAMES MAY, ANTHONY MUSTO, PATRICIA THOMAS, JONATHAN CIANGIULLI, ABBA KADER, CORY TEREICK, STANLEY GRUBER.(PRESS, MACK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - Dr. Craig McCann, SLCG Economic Consulting: First Realty Partners Reg D Offerings: Muppets Do Commercial Real Estate,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - Curriculum Vitae of Dr. McCann
9 9 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/12 12:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ANDREA BOITNOTT, SAM COLLIER, MICHAEL LAW, ANDREA WHITE, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, JAMES MAY, ANTHONY MUSTO, PATRICIA THOMAS, JONATHAN CIANGIULLI, ABBA KADER, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, CORY TEREICK, STANLEY GRUBER, ANTHONY GROSSO, JARED FELDMAN, ANDREW DENARDO, KURT PADAVANO, BILL COMEAU, FRED BATTISTI, JR., MICHAEL HAZINSKI Proof of Service of Defendants in Response to the Court's Text Order (ECF No. 8)(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Anthony Musto,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Jonathan Ciangiulli
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
8 8 order Text Order Tue 02/11 12:07 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (ECF Nos.2 ,3 ). This matter is scheduled for a telephone conference on Thursday, February 13, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. All parties shall attend. Because Defendants have not entered an appearance in this matter, Plaintiffs must properly serve the Complaint (ECF No.1 ), the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (ECF Nos.2 ,3 ), and this Text Order on Defendants and file proof of service by Wednesday, February 12, 2025, at 12:00 p.m. Please use the following dial-in information to connect to the conference: 855-244-8681 then the meeting number 2309 805 0895 followed by ##. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/10/2025. (jab)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
7 7 misc Declaration Mon 02/10 3:17 PM
DECLARATION of Andrew DeNardo re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ANDREA BOITNOTT, SAM COLLIER, MICHAEL LAW, ANDREA WHITE, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, JARED FELDMAN, ANDREW DENARDO, KURT PADAVANO, BILL COMEAU, FRED BATTISTI, JR., MICHAEL HAZINSKI.(BAREENTTO, OMAR) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33,
Att: 34 Exhibit 34
6 6 misc Certification Mon 02/10 3:06 PM
Certification of Omar A. Bareentto on behalf of ANDREA BOITNOTT, SAM COLLIER, MICHAEL LAW, ANDREA WHITE, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, ANTHONY GROSSO, JARED FELDMAN, ANDREW DENARDO, KURT PADAVANO, BILL COMEAU, FRED BATTISTI, JR., MICHAEL HAZINSKI Re2 Motion for TRO,,,,.(BAREENTTO, OMAR) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
5 5 misc Declaration Mon 02/10 3:02 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher Palermo re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ANDREA BOITNOTT, SAM COLLIER, MICHAEL LAW, ANDREA WHITE, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, ANTHONY GROSSO, JARED FELDMAN, ANDREW DENARDO, KURT PADAVANO, BILL COMEAU, FRED BATTISTI, JR., MICHAEL HAZINSKI.(BAREENTTO, OMAR) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
4 4 misc Declaration Mon 02/10 2:57 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher Palermo re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ANDREA BOITNOTT, SAM COLLIER, MICHAEL LAW, ANDREA WHITE, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, JARED FELDMAN, ANDREW DENARDO, KURT PADAVANO, BILL COMEAU, FRED BATTISTI, JR., MICHAEL HAZINSKI.(BAREENTTO, OMAR) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
3 3 respoth Brief Mon 02/10 2:54 PM
BRIEF In Support of Order To Show Cause For Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraints (BAREENTTO, OMAR) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 02/10 2:06 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ANDREA BOITNOTT, SAM COLLIER, MICHAEL LAW, ANDREA WHITE, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, ANTHONY GROSSO, JARED FELDMAN, ANDREW DENARDO, KURT PADAVANO, BILL COMEAU, FRED BATTISTI, JR., MICHAEL HAZINSKI.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/10 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against JONATHAN CIANGIULLI, STANLEY GRUBER, ABBA KADER, JAMES MAY, ANTHONY MUSTO, CORY TEREICK, PATRICIA THOMAS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16007350), filed by TANNEHILL TIC 5 LLC, MAPLE PARK SC TIC 12 MEMBER LLC, SOUTHLAND CROSSINGS REALTY FUND LLC, BILL COMEAU, PC CENTER TIC 1 MEMBER LLC, FNRP REALTY ADVISORS LLC, CROWE'S CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, FIRST NATIONAL REALTY PARTNERS LLC, HV CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, TROPICANA CENTRE LV REALTY FUND LLC, PC CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, CTS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, WESTWOOD SC REALTY FUND LLC, CS CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, BRANDYWINE CROSSING REALTY FUND LLC, SAND HILL PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, VILLAGE AT PITT MILLS REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREA BOITNOTT, MCALPIN SQUARE TIC 5 LLC, SAM COLLIER, SS TULSA CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, ANTHONY GROSSO, ANDREA WHITE, SUMMERDALE PLAZA REALTY FUND LLC, CK CENTER REALTY FUND LLC, KURT PADAVANO, CHRISTOPHER PALERMO, MICHAEL HAZINSKI, MICHAEL LAW, CHAMPIONS VILLAGE REALTY FUND LLC, FRED BATTISTI, JR., JARED FELDMAN, BISHOPS CORNER SC REALTY FUND LLC, MCALPIN SQUARE REALTY FUND LLC, ANDREW DENARDO.(BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 02/10 4:39 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]