Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:25-bk-10977

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:25-ap-01034
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 1:26 PM EDT
Defendant
Bogota Savings Bank
819 Teaneck Road
Teaneck, NJ 07666
Represented By
Bogota Savings Bank
contact info
David H. Stein
Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Tivuna Inc.
5726 1st Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11220
Represented By
Tivuna Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Abdallah Issa
81 Franklin Place
Totowa, NJ 07512
Represented By
Abdallah Issa
contact info
Defendant
Sa-Fe Glass Inc.
206 W. Kendig Road
Willow Street, PA 17584
Represented By
Sa-Fe Glass Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc.
250 Pehle Avenue Suite 503
Saddle Brook, NJ 07663
Represented By
Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Salem El Samna
75 Dale Avenue
Paterson, NJ 07105
Represented By
Salem El Samna
contact info
Defendant
Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC
75 Dale Avenue
Paterson, NJ 07105
Represented By
Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC
contact info
Defendant
Alexander Zurawskyj
67-85 Doremus Avenue
Newark, NJ 07105
Represented By
Michael R. Herz
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Alexander Zurawskyj
contact info
Defendant
Herc Rentals Inc.
67-85 Doremus Avenue
Newark, NJ 07105
Represented By
Herc Rentals Inc.
contact info
Michael R. Herz
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sherwin Williams Co.
101 W. Prospect Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44115
Represented By
Sherwin Williams Co.
contact info
Defendant
Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC
2 Executive Drive Suite 530
Fort Lee, NJ 07024
Represented By
Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fortress Holdings, LLC
555 Preakness Avenue
Totowa, NJ 07512
Represented By
Richard D. Trenk
Trenk Isabel Siddiqi & Shahdanian P.C.
contact info
Robert S. Roglieri
Trenk Isabel Siddiqi & Shahdanian P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Sunday, April 27, 2025
utility Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Adversary Answer Sun 04/27 5:15 PM
Answer Deadline Reset Related [+]. Answer due by 5/1/2025. (jf)
Related: [-] 11 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC,18 Stipulation filed by Defendant Salem El Samna, Defendant Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC
utility Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Adversary Answer Sun 04/27 5:17 PM
Answer Deadline Reset Related [+]. Answer due by 5/1/2025. (jf)
Related: [-] 12 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC,18 Stipulation filed by Defendant Salem El Samna, Defendant Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC
Thursday, April 24, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 04/25 4:26 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/24/2025 Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued to Fortress Holdings, LLC for Service on Bogota Savings Bank Answer due on 3/13/2025; Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Salem El Samna Answer due on 3/13/2025; Herc Rentals Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Abdallah Issa Answer due on 3/13/2025; Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sa-Fe Glass Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sherwin Williams Co. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Tivuna Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Alexander Zurawskyj Answer due on 3/13/2025 Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2025 at 10:00 AM, VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp
Monday, April 21, 2025
19 19 misc Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/21 4:50 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: ALEXANDER ZURAWSKYJ filed by Richard D. Trenk on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Trenk, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation Fri 04/18 11:33 AM
Stipulation Between Salem El Samna, Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC and Fortress Holdings, LLC, re:Extending Time to Answer filed by Saad Admani on behalf of Salem El Samna, Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC. (Admani, Saad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
utility Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Adversary Answer Tue 04/15 4:15 PM
Answer Deadline Reset defendants Alexander Zurawskyj and Herc Rentals, Inc to answer Related [+]. Answer due by 5/14/2025. (jf)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Defendant Bogota Savings Bank,17 Stipulation filed by Defendant Alexander Zurawskyj, Defendant Herc Rentals Inc.
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 04/16 9:57 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/16/2025 Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Fortress Holdings, LLC for Service on Bogota Savings Bank Answer due on 3/13/2025; Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Salem El Samna Answer due on 3/13/2025; Herc Rentals Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Abdallah Issa Answer due on 3/13/2025; Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sa-Fe Glass Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sherwin Williams Co. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Tivuna Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Alexander Zurawskyj Answer due on 3/13/2025 Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2025 at 10:00 AM, VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 04/14 11:19 AM
Stipulation Between Herc Rentals Inc., Alexander Zurawskyj and Fortress Holdings, LLC, re:Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Michael R. Herz on behalf of Herc Rentals Inc., Alexander Zurawskyj. (Herz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/11 3:33 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Richard D. Trenk on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Trenk, Richard)
Related: [-] 10 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC,11 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC,12 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC,13 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC,14 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC,15 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
15 15 misc Request to Enter Default Wed 04/09 2:11 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support
14 14 misc Request to Enter Default Wed 04/09 1:41 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Tivuna Inc. filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support
13 13 misc Request to Enter Default Wed 04/09 1:34 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Sherwin Williams Co. filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support
12 12 misc Request to Enter Default Wed 04/09 1:13 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support
11 11 misc Request to Enter Default Wed 04/09 12:57 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Salem El Samna filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support
10 10 misc Request to Enter Default Wed 04/09 12:38 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Sa-Fe Glass Inc. filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification in Support
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/02 5:01 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by David H. Stein on behalf of Bogota Savings Bank. (Stein, David)
Related: [-] 8 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: Summary Judgment In Lieu of Answer in favor of Bogota Savings Bank and against Fortress Holdings, LLC. Filed by Bogota Savings Bank.Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 10:00 AM, VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J # 12 Exhibit K # 13 Exhibit L # 14 Exhibit M # 15 Exhibit N # 16 Exhibit O # 17 Memorandum of Law # 18 Statement of Material Facts # 19 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Bogota Savings Bank
8 8 3 pgs motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/02 10:51 AM
Motion For Summary Judgment RE: Summary Judgment In Lieu of Answer in favor of Bogota Savings Bank and against Fortress Holdings, LLC. Filed by Bogota Savings Bank.Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 10:00 AM, VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.. (Stein, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Att: 9 Exhibit H
Att: 10 Exhibit I
Att: 11 Exhibit J
Att: 12 Exhibit K
Att: 13 Exhibit L
Att: 14 Exhibit M
Att: 15 Exhibit N
Att: 16 Exhibit O
Att: 17 Memorandum of Law
Att: 18 Statement of Material Facts
Att: 19 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
utility Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Adversary Answer Tue 03/11 11:47 AM
Answer Deadline Reset only as to Alexander Zurawksyj and Herc Rentals, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Defendant Herc Rentals, Inc. Alexander Zurawskyj. Answer due by 4/14/2025. (jf
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 03/10 3:32 PM
Stipulation Between Herc Rentals Inc., Alexander Zurawskyj and Fortress Holdings LLC, re:Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Michael R. Herz on behalf of Herc Rentals Inc., Alexander Zurawskyj. (Herz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
utility Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Adversary Answer Fri 02/28 8:58 AM
Answer Deadline Reset for Bogota Savings Bank only Related [+]. Answer due by 4/2/2025. (jf)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Defendant Bogota Savings Bank
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 02/26 4:37 PM
Stipulation Between Bogota Savings Bank and Plaintiff, Fortress Holdings, LLC, re:Extending Time to Answer for Defendant, Bogota Savings Ban Related [+] filed by David H. Stein on behalf of Bogota Savings Bank. (Stein, David)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 02/11 4:46 PM
Summons Issued to Fortress Holdings, LLC for Service on Bogota Savings Bank Answer due on 3/13/2025; Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Salem El Samna Answer due on 3/13/2025; Herc Rentals Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Abdallah Issa Answer due on 3/13/2025; Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sa-Fe Glass Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sherwin Williams Co. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Tivuna Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Alexander Zurawskyj Answer due on 3/13/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachment
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/11 1:17 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Richard D. Trenk on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Trenk, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 25-01034 Complaint by Fortress Holdings, LLC against Bogota Savings Bank ; Tivuna Inc. ; Abdallah Issa ; Sa-Fe Glass Inc. ; Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. ; Salem El Samna ; Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC ; Alexander Zurawskyj ; Herc Rentals Inc. ; Sherwin Williams Co. ; Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) filed by Plaintiff Fortress Holdings, LLC,2 Summons Issued to Fortress Holdings, LLC for Service on Bogota Savings Bank Answer due on 3/13/2025; Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Salem El Samna Answer due on 3/13/2025; Herc Rentals Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Abdallah Issa Answer due on 3/13/2025; Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sa-Fe Glass Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sherwin Williams Co. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Tivuna Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Alexander Zurawskyj Answer due on 3/13/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 4/15/2025 at 11:30 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attachment)
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 02/11 11:50 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Robert S. Roglieri on behalf of Fortress Holdings, LLC. (Roglieri, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 02/11 9:30 AM
Summons Issued to Fortress Holdings, LLC for Service on Bogota Savings Bank Answer due on 3/13/2025; Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Salem El Samna Answer due on 3/13/2025; Herc Rentals Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Abdallah Issa Answer due on 3/13/2025; Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sa-Fe Glass Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sherwin Williams Co. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Tivuna Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Alexander Zurawskyj Answer due on 3/13/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 4/15/2025 at 11:30 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachment
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Tue 02/11 4:42 PM
Hearing Withdrawn Related [+] (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Fortress Holdings, LLC for Service on Bogota Savings Bank Answer due on 3/13/2025; Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Salem El Samna Answer due on 3/13/2025; Herc Rentals Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Abdallah Issa Answer due on 3/13/2025; Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sa-Fe Glass Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC Answer due on 3/13/2025; Sherwin Williams Co. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Tivuna Inc. Answer due on 3/13/2025; Alexander Zurawskyj Answer due on 3/13/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 4/15/2025 at 11:30 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attachment)
Monday, February 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/10 11:41 AM
Adversary case 25-01034 Complaint by Fortress Holdings, LLC against Bogota Savings Bank ; Tivuna Inc. ; Abdallah Issa ; Sa-Fe Glass Inc. ; Eastern Concrete Materials, Inc. ; Salem El Samna ; Samna Construction and Steel Fabrication LLC ; Alexander Zurawskyj ; Herc Rentals Inc. ; Sherwin Williams Co. ; Kaufman Semeraro & Liebman LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Trenk, Richard)
Related: [-]