Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Patricia D Barksdale
Case #: 3:25-cv-00140
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:13 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 134.56.134.170
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Christian W. Waugh
Waugh PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 05/13 2:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC's motion for an extension of time. The deadline to serve process is extended to July 10, 2025. For future motions, counsel must not cite "Local Rule 7.1(a)(3)," which is not a local rule of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on May 13, 2025. (KG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 05/12 2:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File within which to effectuate service by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/03 1:38 PM
ORDER granting 7 the plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third-party subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 3/3/2025. (KG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/24 3:23 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jorge Arco,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Susan Stalzer,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Subpoena
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 02/21 11:16 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 misc Copyright Report Tue 02/11 3:39 PM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (LNR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Order
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/11 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/10 2:42 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:25-cv-00140-MMH-PDB. (JOS)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 02/10 11:29 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/10 11:27 AM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23003418) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log