Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Ronald C Griffin
Case #: 7:25-cv-00068
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 5:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Tim Glass
Defendant
Integrated Consulting & Inspection International, LLC
Defendant
Michael McCroskey
Defendant
Ruthann Sparrow
Defendant
Tablerock Land Services, LLC
Defendant
Peter Woody
Plaintiff
John C Holloway
Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated Moore & Associates 440 LOUISIANA ST STE 1110
HOUSTON, TX 77002
Represented By
Curt Hesse
Moore & Associates
contact info
Melissa Moore
Moore & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Service Wed 03/12 5:14 PM
Acknowledgment of Service returned by John C Holloway. Integrated Consulting & Inspection International, LLC served on 3/3/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Acknowledgment of Service Wed 03/12 5:14 PM
Acknowledgment of Service returned by John C Holloway. Tablerock Land Services, LLC served on 3/3/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 4:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Integrated Consulting & Inspection International, LLC, Tablerock Land Services, LLC. (kg)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/11 2:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by John C Holloway. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 notice Notice Mon 02/10 4:11 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by John C Holloway (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 02/10 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Moore on behalf of John C Holloway (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/10 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19774195). No Summons requested at this time, filed by John C Holloway.(Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/11 11:20 AM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kg)
Related: [-]