California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:25-mc-80031
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/03 11:27 AM
NOTICE by Netflix, Inc. re1 Motion to Quash Subpoena, Non-Party Netflix, Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash Subpoenas (Morey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 8:22 PM
ORDER Granting 9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on February 17, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 8:21 PM
ORDER Granting 8 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on February 17, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 11:46 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number BCANDC-20356846.) filed by VideoLabs, Inc..(Tseng, LeinWeih)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/17 11:37 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20356833.) filed by VideoLabs, Inc..(Len, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, February 13, 2025
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 02/13 12:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Netflix, Inc. re5 Order, (Morey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 02/12 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Holt Andrews on behalf of VideoLabs, Inc. (Andrews, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 9:15 AM
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on February 12, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 utility ~Util - Miscellaneous Case Assigned by Intake Tue 02/11 9:26 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 02/10 3:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Netflix, Inc. (Morey, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 02/10 2:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Netflix, Inc. (Morey, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Motion to Quash Subpoena Mon 02/10 2:55 PM
MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA against VideoLabs, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 52, receipt number ACANDC-20332999.). Filed by Netflix, Inc..(Morey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael R. Morey,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Certificate/Proof of Service