Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:25-cv-00331
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause12:191 Bank Foreclosure
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Capital Fund REIT LLC
JACK O'BOYLE & ASSOCIATES PLLC PO BOX 815369
DALLAS, TX 75381
Represented By
Travis H Gray
Jack O'Boyle & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Gray Dog Investments LLC
Represented By
Jules P Slim
Attorney And Counselor
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order For ADR Mon 04/14 2:17 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints John T Wooldridge as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/11/2025. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/14/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 04/14 9:27 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Travis H. Gray is terminated. Andrew Bell, Melissa Alonso, Jessie Manzewitsch, and Gabriella Alonso of the law firm Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP are substituted. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/14/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/14 2:19 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17. Mon Apr 14 14:19:27 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
15 15 misc Supplemental Document Thu 04/10 4:31 PM
Supplemental Document by Capital Fund REIT LLC as to9 Status Report to Rule 26 Joint Report . (Bell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 04/10 12:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Melissa Alonso, Jessie Manzewitsch, Gabriella Alonso added attorney Andrew William Bell,Andrew William Bell for Capital Fund REIT LLC. Motion filed by Capital Fund REIT LLCAttorney Andrew William Bell added to party Capital Fund REIT LLC(pty:dft) (Bell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 order Order Mon 03/10 9:55 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Parties filed a Stipulation of Enlargement of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 11]. The Court will construe this as a Motion for Extension of Time. The Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff Gray Dog Investments LLC's time to respond to Defendant Capital Fund Reit LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to Friday, May 23, 2025. Defendant's Reply is due on or before Friday, June 6, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/10/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 3:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 12/8/2025 before Judge Jane J Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/13/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 3/13/2025. Motions due by 9/9/2025. Discovery due by 8/10/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/11/2025. Pretrial Order due by 11/24/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 11/24/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/6/2025) (cfk)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 03/06 2:22 PM
STIPULATION of Enlargement of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc 6] by Gray Dog Investments LLC. (Slim, Jules)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gray Dog Investments LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Slim, Jules)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Status Report Wed 03/05 3:00 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Capital Fund Reit LLC. (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
8 8 respm Appendix in Support Thu 02/13 1:52 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Capital Fund Reit LLC re6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Thu 02/13 1:51 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Capital Fund Reit LLC re6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Summary Judgment Thu 02/13 1:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Capital Fund Reit LLC (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/13 12:35 PM
NOTICE of CAPITAL FUND REIT, LLCS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Capital Fund Reit LLC (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 02/12 12:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital Fund Reit LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Status Report Order Wed 02/12 9:03 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2025. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/12/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
2 2 qcref Boyle Tue 02/11 9:48 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/10 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Capital Fund REIT, LLC. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-15254415) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D