Mississippi Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Katharine M Samson
Case #: 6:25-bk-50179
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Southern Colonel Homes, Inc.
7390 U S Highway 49
Hattiesburg, MS 39402-9103
Represented By
Craig M. Geno
Law Offices Of Craig M. Geno, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
501 East Court Street Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
utility Change Claim Name Mon 05/05 10:21 AM
Claim owner modified from Internal Revenue Service to Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service. Reason for modification: Incorrect claim owner selected (akb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
139 139 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 05/04 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 138 Order to Show Cause
Friday, May 02, 2025
138 138 order Show Cause Fri 05/02 12:22 PM
Order to Show Cause Related [+]. Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/22/2025 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom - Hattiesburg. (kaw)
Related: [-] 35 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Mathieu Bougere