Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Harvey E Schlesinger
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00147
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
HealthFund Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Nigro
Williams Parker Harrison Dietz & Getzen
contact info
David Michael Blank
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
contact info
Brian Stimson
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By
Erica Dawn Rosenbaum
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Jared Joseph Burns
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Jamie R. Kurtz
Robins Kaplan, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Gleason
Robins Kaplan, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
32 32 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 05/07 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
31 31 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 05/07 7:44 AM
ORDER granting 17 Florida Blue's Motion to Remand to State Court; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 5/5/2025. (TPL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/28 4:45 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 04/23 3:52 PM
ORDER granting 28 HealthFund's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply; HealthFund may file a reply memorandum, not to exceed 7 pages, within 3 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/23/2025. (TPL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/22 6:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/15 1:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Mon 04/14 12:51 PM
ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, 19 HealthFund's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit; granting 25 Florida Blue's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/11/2025. (TPL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
25 25 motion File Excess Pages Wed 04/09 2:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages for Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 4:40 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 OPPOSED MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
23 23 motion Dismiss Tue 03/25 8:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response to motion Tue 03/25 2:45 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
21 21 motion Stay Mon 03/24 7:05 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Case Management Report Mon 03/24 6:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion File Excess Pages Mon 03/24 1:57 PM
MOTION to File Excess Pages by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Request Oral Argument Wed 03/19 1:06 PM
ORDER denying as moot 13 HealthFund's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 14 Defendant's Request for Oral Argument. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/19/2025. (TPL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
17 17 motion Remand to State Court Wed 03/12 8:21 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 03/11 9:11 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc... (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/11 9:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against HealthFund Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc..(Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Monday, March 03, 2025
14 14 motion Request for Oral Argument Mon 03/03 6:48 PM
REQUEST for oral argument re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/03 6:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/24 3:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Special Admission. If Brian R. Stimson, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/24/2025. (TAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/21 5:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Brian R. Stimson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23049927 for $150 by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 02/21 1:49 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Erica Dawn Rosenbaum, Jamie R. Kurtz, Jared Joseph Burns and Jeffrey S. Gleason of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JVC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 02/20 6:59 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by HealthFund Solutions, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 02/12 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David Michael Blank on behalf of HealthFund Solutions, LLC. Lead Counsel: David M. Blank. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/12 1:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before March 3, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/12/2025. (TAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/12 10:25 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL All counsel of record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/11 1:08 PM
NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a), which requires the parties to conduct a planning conference and file a case management report. Because Judge Schlesinger schedules ERISA cases differently than the routine civil case, the parties are directed to use Judge Schlesinger's ERISA Case Management Report, which is attached to this docket entry. (TPL)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/11 9:32 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:25-cv-147-HES-MCR. Motion(s) REFERRED:2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (AA)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 cmp Complaint Wed 02/12 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT against HealthFund Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. Filed in State Court on 12/4/2024(KME) . Modified on 2/12/2025 to edit docket text (AJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 02/10 8:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by HEALTHFUND SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Blank, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/10 6:23 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 16-2024 006596-AXXX-MA filed in State Court on 12/04/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23006574 filed by HEALTHFUND SOLUTIONS, LLC.(Blank, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Order Setting Case Management Plan,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet