Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:25-cv-00078
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of substitution of AUSA Mon 04/07 11:48 AM
Notice of substitution of AUSA. Chauncey Arthur Bratt substituting for Jillian M. Jewell. (Bratt, Chauncey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of appearance Tue 03/04 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian M. Jewell on behalf of Warden, FCC Coleman - Camp (Jewell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order to respond to habeas petition Wed 02/26 12:47 PM
ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Petitioner has 45 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/26/2025.(KLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition
Friday, February 21, 2025
misc Fees Paid Fri 02/21 10:36 AM
FEES Paid by Chauncey Gregory (Filing fee $5.00, Receipt Number OCA-13871). (KLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
2 2 order Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants Mon 02/10 4:58 PM
STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/10/2025. (MGB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 02/10 2:57 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by Chauncey Gregory. (No fees paid, no service copies provided)(MGB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope