Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:25-cv-00637
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 5:39 AM EDT
Defendant
The Prentice - Hall Corporation System: TransUnion LLC
Defendant
TransUnion LLC
Plaintiff
Ernie Samuel
P.O. Box 216
Roswell, GA 30077


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 04/14 4:34 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as frivolous. (tmf)
Related: [-]
8 8 5 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Mon 04/14 4:32 PM
ORDER: After considering the Final Report and Recommendation [Doc.6 ], and reviewing it for clear error, the Court hereby receives the R&R with approval and ADOPTS its recommendation as the opinion and order of the Court. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/14/2025. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/14 4:36 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ernie Samuel re8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,9 Clerk's Judgment. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/14 4:37 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 04/07 6:24 PM
Submission of6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Complaint, filed by Ernie Samuel, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (sll)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 03/17 4:12 PM
ORDER for Service of6 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/17/2025. (tmf)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Mon 03/17 4:10 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Complaint, filed by Ernie Samuel. I RECOMMEND that this case be dismissed without prejudice under Local Rule 41.3(A)(2) based on Samuels failure to obey a Court Order, or that this case be dismissed without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) (ii) because it is frivolous. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/17/2025. (tmf)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/17 9:45 AM
ORDER approving and adopting the 3 Final Report and Recommendation in case 1:25-cv-835-WMR. The Court ORDERS that 1:25-cv-835-WMR be consolidated into this case, which shall be the lead case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to effectuate the consolidation and administratively terminate this action (1:25-cv-00835). Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/17/25. (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/17 9:56 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ernie Samuel re5 Order. (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/17 4:14 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ernie Samuel re6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Complaint, filed by Ernie Samuel,7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/12 3:50 PM
ORDER DECLINING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William M. Ray, II for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:25-cv-00637-WMR-CMS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/12/2025. (tmf)
Related: [-]
3 3 18 pgs order Order ruling on IFP Wed 02/12 1:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis for these proceedings only. I ORDER Samuel either to (A) submit an amended complaint or (B) submit a filing stating that he does not wish to amend his complaint WITHIN TWENTY-EIGHT DAYS of the entry date of this Order. I will thereafter prepare for the Court a Report and Recommendation with respect to whether dismissal under Section 1915(e)(2) is warranted. I STAY service of process pending further review of Samuel's complaint or amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/12/2025. (tmf)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 02/12 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Ernie Samuel.(tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/12 1:21 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ernie Samuel re3 Order ruling on IFP. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/12 3:53 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ernie Samuel re4 Order. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 02/10 4:05 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/10 4:04 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ernie Samuel.(cpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet