North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Kenneth D Bell
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 5:24-cv-00098
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 9:13 PM EST
Defendant
Taiji Group USA, Inc.
Interested Party
United States of America
Represented By
J. Seth Johnson
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Sidesolve LLC
Represented By
Jason Marcus
Bracker & Marcus LLC
contact info
Phavady Panyanouvong-Rubeck
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/10 3:20 PM
ORDER granting 14 Notice of Election to Intervene to Effectuate Settlement and Motion to Unseal Certain Case Documents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 2/10/2025. (brl)
Related: [-]
DELETED ENTRY(brl).
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
14 14 2 pgs NOTICE of Election to Intervene to Effectuate Settlement and MOTION to Unseal Certain Case Documents by United States of America(Johnson, J.) Modified on 2/10/2025 to convert to motion (mek).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
2 2 COMPLAINT against Taiji Group USA, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 9050), filed by Sidesolve LLC.(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 1 pgs Envelope