New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00182
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 12:15 AM MST
Defendant
Ezequiel Adelso Gomez (1)
Represented By
Victoria Trull
Federal Public Defender'S Office Las Cruces
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Richard C Williams
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/11/2025 12:23 AM MST
Thursday, February 06, 2025
Arrest of Ezequiel Adelso-Gomez (cfa)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 09, 2025
Hearing as to Ezequiel Adelso-Gomez: Initial Appearance set for 2/10/2025 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (cfa)
Related: [-]