Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Timothy W Dore
Case #: 2:25-bk-10349
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Mar 10, 2025

Debtor
Atlas Roofing & Construction, LLC
30217 Oso Loop Rd
Arlington, WA 98223-9321
Represented By
Thomas D Neeleman
Neeleman Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Kathleen V Shoemaker
PO Box 227
Seahurst, WA 98062
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 02/11/2025 12:01 AM PST
Monday, February 10, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 02/10 5:18 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition ( 25-10349 [misc,1028] ( 338.00). Receipt number A28701488. Fee amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Creditors Uploaded Mon 02/10 5:31 PM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 5 creditor(s). (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (OTC) Mon 02/10 5:13 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual . Filed by Thomas D Neeleman of Neeleman Law Group on behalf of Atlas Roofing & Construction, LLC (Neeleman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAWBApi Meeting of Creditors-Business Chapter 7 - No Asset Mon 02/10 5:20 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Shoemaker, Kathleen V with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/10/2025 at 12:00 PM via 341 Zoom Shoemaker: Meeting ID 748 186 6715, Passcode 0136221891, Phone 1-206-970-8680. (Neeleman, Thomas)
Related: [-]