California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:25-cv-01344
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 2:59 AM PDT
Defendant
Textron, Inc.
Represented By
Todd Andrew Roberts
Ropers Majeski PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia J. Lopez
Represented By
John Charles Stein
The Boccardo Law Firm
contact info
Justin Chou
Walkupmelodia Kelly Schoenberger
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward M. Lopez
Represented By
John Charles Stein
The Boccardo Law Firm
contact info
Justin Chou
Walkupmelodia Kelly Schoenberger
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 02/24 1:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Edward M. Lopez, Cynthia J. Lopez (Chou, Justin)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 02/24 1:41 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edward M. Lopez, Cynthia J. Lopez.. (Chou, Justin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 02/24 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Justin Chou on behalf of Edward M. Lopez, Cynthia J. Lopez (Chou, Justin)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 02/24 11:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 3/10/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/12 3:18 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Textron, Inc... (Roberts, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 02/11 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Textron, Inc. (Roberts, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
1 1 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 02/10 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Textron, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]