Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 2:25-cv-01153
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Case in other court:Virginia Eastern, 3:25-cv-00014
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:38 AM EDT
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC.
Defendant
ZINC HEALTH SERVICES LLC
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
Defendant
Optum Inc.
Defendant
OPTUMRX INC.
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
Defendant
EMISAR PHARMA SERVICES LLC
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
Defendant
Ascent Health Services LLC
In Re
ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
Chesterfield County, Virginia
Represented By
William Edgar Spivey
Kaufman & Canoles PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 10:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. UnitedHealth Group Inc waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. Optum Inc. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 10:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. OptumInsight Inc. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 10:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. OPTUMRX INC. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 10:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. EMISAR PHARMA SERVICES LLC waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 1:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. CAREMARK L.L.C. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; CAREMARK RX L.L.C. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; CVS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; ZINC HEALTH SERVICES LLC waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 1:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. Ascent Health Services LLC waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; EVERNORTH HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; Express Scripts Inc. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 1:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 1:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 1:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesterfield County, Virginia. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. (PIFKO, MARK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 8:59 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ascent Health Services LLC, CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC, CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, EMISAR PHARMA SERVICES LLC, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC., Express Scripts Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUMRX INC., Optum Inc., OptumInsight Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UnitedHealth Group Inc, ZINC HEALTH SERVICES LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, )
Related: [-]
4 4 mdl MDL Notice to Counsel Tue 02/11 8:58 AM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (krg, )
Related: [-]
3 3 transfer Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer Tue 02/11 8:32 AM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:25-cv-00014. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 02/11 8:34 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Tue 02/11 8:38 AM
Pursuant to a transfer order entered in MDL No. 3080 on 2/10/2025, Eastern District of Virginia case number 3 25-00014 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2 25-1153 In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (krg, )
Related: [-]
order Case Management Order Tue 02/11 8:59 AM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
2 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-23) - 4 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in MD/1:25-cv-00096, 389 in MDL No. 3080, 1 in VAE/1:25-cv-00044, 2 in VAE/3:25-cv-00014, 1 in VAW/7:25-cv-00015) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel James V. Ingold on 2/10/2025. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3080, MD/1:25-cv-00096, VAE/1:25-cv-00044, VAE/3:25-cv-00014, VAW/7:25-cv-00015 (TF) (adun, )
Related: [-]
***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-23) Finalized on 2/10/25. Please see pleading (3 in MD/1:25-cv-00096, 391 in MDL No. 3080, 3 in VAE/1:25-cv-00044, 4 in VAE/3:25-cv-00014, 3 in VAW/7:25-cv-00015). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the D. New Jersey for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel James V. Ingold on 2/10/2025.Associated Cases: MDL No. 3080, MD/1:25-cv-00096, VAE/1:25-cv-00044, VAE/3:25-cv-00014, VAW/7:25-cv-00015 (TF) (adun, )
Related: [-]
Case electronically transferred to the District of New Jersey per Conditional Transfer Order CTO-23 of the MDL Panel 3080. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
Notice of Correction- Attorney reminded to file the proposed summons or notice of waiver of service. Pro Hac Vice applications must also be filed as soon as possible. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
1 1 200 pgs Complaint for Damages ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9941447.), filed by Chesterfield County, Virginia.(Spivey, William) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/13/2025) (adun, ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (adun, )
Related: [-]