VALERA ARCEO et al v PFIZER INC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Hope T Cannon |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00098 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2025 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:24-cv-08312 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
PFIZER INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
|
|
Plaintiff
FREDI VALERA ARCEO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RACHEL VALERA ARCEO
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Terminated: 03/12/2025
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Terminated: 03/12/2025
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Terminated: 03/12/2025
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 03/28 8:14 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:35 Answer to Amended Complaint, re:33 Amended Complaint (djb) |
||
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() ANSWER to33 Amended Complaint by PFIZER INC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC, PHARMACIA LLC. (PETROSINELLI, JOSEPH) |
|
34 | 34
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH G PETROSINELLI on behalf of PFIZER INC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC, PHARMACIA LLC (PETROSINELLI, JOSEPH) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Sunday, December 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Set Deadlines/Hearings: (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/10/2025.] | ||
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Friday, December 06, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 CLERK'S NOTICE re: ECF No.14 . The consent/declination form is signed by counsel but does not indicate the party/parties in the space under counsel's signature - COUNSEL FOR (OR "PRO SE"). Counsel is directed to file a revised consent/declination form by 12/13/2024 that includes the name(s) of the party/parties counsel represents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/10/2025.] | |
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Friday, November 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/10/2025.] | |
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . [err102] NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Tracy Ann Finken - The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by Rachel Valera Arceo, Fredi Valera Arceo (anj, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/10/2025.] | ||
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . [err102] ONE SUMMONS FOR ALL DEFENDANTS: Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendant on THREE summons, a maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 4 Proposed Summons filed by Rachel Valera Arceo, Fredi Valera Arceo, 2 Proposed Summons filed by Rachel Valera Arceo, Fredi Valera Arceo, 5 Proposed Summons filed by Rachel Valera Arceo, Fredi Valera Arceo, 3 Proposed Summons filed by Rachel Valera Arceo, Fredi Valera Arceo, 7 Proposed Summons filed by Rachel Valera Arceo, Fredi Valera Arceo, 6 Proposed Summons filed by Rachel Valera Arceo, Fredi Valera Arceo (anj, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/10/2025.] |