Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:25-cv-00164
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Na-Quan Kurt Lewis
30 Elsmere Blvd. Apt. #2
Wilmington, DE 19801
Plaintiff
State of Delaware


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 misc Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 03/07 2:36 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of D.I.5 Letter remanding this case to the Court of Common Pleas of New Castle County. (mpb) Modified on 3/7/2025 (ceg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/04 8:38 AM
Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Na-Quan Kurt Lewis. Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 misc Letter Fri 02/21 10:40 AM
Letter to Court of Common Pleas from U.S. District Court of Delaware, in regards to remanding the above captioned case. (scs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/20 3:49 PM
ORDER: It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to REMAND this action to the Delaware Court of Common Pleas, and the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (D.I.1 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/20/2025. (scs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/12 11:25 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
3 3 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 02/11 11:19 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (scs)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/11 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Common Pleas of the State of Delaware, Case Numbers: 2409007703, and 2410014146 - filed by Na-Quan Kurt Lewis.(scs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/11 11:14 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Na-Quan Kurt Lewis. (scs)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 02/11 11:29 AM
Remark: A signed Mag Consent form submitted by Na-Quan Lewis has been stored in the case file. A Pro-Se privacy notice has also been mailed to Na-Quan Lewis. (scs)
Related: [-]