Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:25-cv-20619
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Ercilia Holdings LLC
Represented By
Dick M. Ortega
Ortega Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Miami Autos Corp.
Represented By
Dick M. Ortega
Ortega Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Renzo Barberi
Represented By
Ronald E. Stern
The Advocacy Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 04/02 1:51 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: This case is closed, and all pending motions are denied as moot. Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Mon 03/31 6:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Renzo Barberi(Stern, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 03/24 9:54 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 4, 2025 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/24/2025. (bbp)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/24 10:01 AM
Reset Deadlines Ercilia Holdings LLC ranswer due 4/4/2025; Miami Autos Corp. answer due 4/4/2025. Per DE#10. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 03/21 2:59 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Miami Autos Corp., Ercilia Holdings LLC.(Ortega, Dick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 03/07 9:30 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 25, 2025 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/7/2025. (bbp)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/07 10:01 AM
Reset Deadlines Ercilia Holdings LLC /answer due 3/25/2025; Miami Autos Corp. answer due 3/25/2025. Per DE#8. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 03/06 7:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Miami Autos Corp., Ercilia Holdings LLC.(Ortega, Dick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 03/06 7:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dick M. Ortega on behalf of Miami Autos Corp., Ercilia Holdings LLC. Attorney Dick M. Ortega added to party Miami Autos Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Dick M. Ortega added to party Ercilia Holdings LLC(pty:dft). (Ortega, Dick)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 02/24 12:17 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renzo Barberi. Miami Autos Corp. served on 2/20/2025, response/answer due 3/13/2025. (Stern, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 02/19 11:13 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renzo Barberi. Ercilia Holdings LLC served on 2/18/2025, response/answer due 3/11/2025. (Stern, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 2:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Ercilia Holdings LLC, Miami Autos Corp.. (ksr)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 02/11 1:58 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ksr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 12:51 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18195672, filed by Renzo Barberi.(Stern, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)