Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Case #: 2:25-cv-00096
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 4:41 AM MDT
Defendant
Blendjet
Defendant
Mavorco Holdings
Represented By
George B. Hofmann, IV
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Lucy Jewett Wheatley
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Kathryn Tunacik
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Defendant
Mavorco IP
Represented By
George B. Hofmann, IV
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Lucy Jewett Wheatley
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Kathryn Tunacik
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Defendant
Mavorco Operations
Represented By
George B. Hofmann, IV
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Lucy Jewett Wheatley
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Kathryn Tunacik
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Blendtec
Represented By
Brett L. Foster
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L. Kapaloski
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
60 60 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/14 5:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re51 MOTION to Strike44 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Memorandum in Support (Mavorco's Thirteenth Affirmative Defense) filed by Defendants Mavorco Holdings, Mavorco IP, Mavorco Operations. (Wheatley, Lucy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
59 59 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/09 6:10 PM
Second AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of David Franklyn in Support re25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Blendtec, Counter Defendant Blendtec.(Kapaloski, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - David Franklyn Supplemental Expert Report
58 58 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/09 6:07 PM
Second AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Brian Buchanan in Support re25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Blendtec, Counter Defendant Blendtec.(Kapaloski, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summary of Marketplace Research,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - IBIS Industry Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Blender Market Report
57 57 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/09 6:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Blendtec, Counter Defendant Blendtec.(Kapaloski, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - BLEND Definition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Blendjet Website as of May 7, 2025,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - McGuire Woods Agreement