California Central District Court
Judge:Dean D Pregerson
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:25-cv-01155
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 3:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Nokes And Quinn Apc
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Jared Lockhart
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Charlotte Ann Long
Trans Union LLC
contact info
Defendant
Columbia Debt Recovery, LLC
Represented By
David J. Kaminski
Carlson And Messer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashna Paul
Represented By
Matthew Michael Loker
Loker Law, Apc
contact info
Nicholas J Enns
Loker Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Atul Paul
Represented By
Matthew Michael Loker
Loker Law, Apc
contact info
Nicholas J Enns
Loker Law, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
34 34 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/25 3:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
33 33 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 04/17 12:44 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT,32 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Equifax's Stipulation is GRANTED, and Equifax shall file a responsive pleading on or before April 28, 2025. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
32 32 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 04/16 12:10 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 04/28/2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend time for Equifax to Answer
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
31 31 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/15 2:16 PM
Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Columbia Debt Recovery, LLC, (Kaminski, David)
Related: [-]
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/15 11:20 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Columbia Debt Recovery, LLC.(Kaminski, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/10 10:15 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Lockhart, Jared)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
28 28 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/09 11:07 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 6/16/2025 at 11:00 AM. See document for details and deadlines. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/07 1:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Long, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 03/12 5:16 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Columbia Debt Recovery, LLC answer now due 4/10/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Columbia Debt Recovery, LLC.(Attorney David J. Kaminski added to party Columbia Debt Recovery, LLC(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/12 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
24 24 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 03/12 10:38 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 4/17/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
23 23 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/10 8:10 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC identifying Transunion, Transunion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Long, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
22 22 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 03/10 8:09 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Trans Union LLC answer now due 4/8/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Attorney Charlotte Ann Long added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft))(Long, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/04 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Lockhart, Jared)
Related: [-]
20 20 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 03/04 4:19 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 4/10/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Jared Lockhart added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lockhart, Jared)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/04 3:18 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul, upon Defendant Trans Union LLC served on 2/18/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saecho, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/04 3:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/18/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/04 3:10 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul, upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 2/25/2025, answer due 3/18/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alicia Smith, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/04 3:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul, upon Defendant Columbia Debt Recovery, LLC served on 2/18/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saecho, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 02/20 11:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel must refer to the Central District's website at "http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov" for Judge Dean D. Pregerson's Procedures and Schedules. Counsel must review the Court's Standing Order and CV Trial Order, and comply with the same. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing a motion. [See document for further details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
14 14 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/12 3:21 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Trans Union LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/12 3:19 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Columbia Debt Recovery, LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/12 3:18 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/12 3:16 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 02/12 3:07 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 02/12 3:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 02/12 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
7 7 notice Summons Request Tue 02/11 11:29 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Tue 02/11 11:29 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 02/11 11:28 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 02/11 11:27 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 02/11 11:21 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ashna Paul, Atul Paul. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 02/11 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul, (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 02/11 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39083595 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Ashna Paul, Atul Paul. (Attorney Matthew Michael Loker added to party Ashna Paul(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Michael Loker added to party Atul Paul(pty:pla))(Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]