New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:25-cv-01222
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Willow Baer
Defendant
Shauna Carter
Defendant
Civil Service Employees Association, Inc., Local 1000, AFSCME, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Leslie Catherine Perrin
Civil Service Employees Association, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Teresa Meadows
Defendant
Shermake Tannis
Defendant
Dawn Wilson
Defendant
New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities
Defendant
The State Of New York
Defendant
Stephanie Thomas
Plaintiff
Suzette De Souza
Represented By
Anthony Joseph Harwood
Harwood Law PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
New York State Office for People with Development Disabilities
Terminated: 02/14/2025
Defendant
State Of New York
Terminated: 02/14/2025


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
56 56 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/30 2:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by SHERMARKE TANNIS. Document filed by Suzette De Souza..(Harwood, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
55 55 order Memo Endorsement Tue 04/29 2:52 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:54 Letter filed by Suzette De Souza. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for their status letter. Given the parties' positions, the Court is not inclined to refer this matter for a settlement conference or mediation until at least after the motions to dismiss are resolved. The parties may write the Court at any time should their positions change. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/29/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
54 54 misc Letter Mon 04/28 3:45 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from ALL PARTIES dated 4/28/2025 re: PRETRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Document filed by Suzette De Souza..(Harwood, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
53 53 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 04/25 11:46 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:52 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss and Strike . . Document filed by Civil Service Employees Association, Inc., Local 1000, AFSCME, AFL-CIO..(Perrin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
52 52 motion Dismiss Fri 04/25 11:43 AM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss and Strike . Document filed by Civil Service Employees Association, Inc., Local 1000, AFSCME, AFL-CIO..(Perrin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Leslie C. Perrin in Support of Defendant CSEA's Motion to Dismiss and Strike,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Closure Notice,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - CBA Arts. 44 and 45