Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Terry A Doughty
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:25-cv-00169
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 4:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Mohammad Aly Bakeer
Defendant
St Francis Medical Center
309 Jackson St
Monroe, LA 71210
Represented By
Alexandra Cobb Hains
Breazeale Sachse & Wilson (br)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelvin Stallion
720 Brisco Ave #205
Bastrop, LA 71220


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
27 27 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/16 2:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re18 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dr. Mohammad Aly Bakeer MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,23 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Mohammed Bakeer M.D. filed by Kelvin Stallion.(crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/16 2:03 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re23 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Mohammed Bakeer M.D. filed by Mohammad Aly Bakeer. (aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified to more accurately describe document on 5/16/2025 (Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
25 25 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/16 10:23 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re18 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dr. Mohammad Aly Bakeer MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kelvin Stallion.(crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/24 4:46 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: re23 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Mohammed Bakeer M.D. filed by Mohammad Aly Bakeer, Set Responses due by 5/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 4/24/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/24 2:59 PM
Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Mohammed Bakeer M.D. by Mohammad Aly Bakeer. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky.(aty,Sartor, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Supp Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Enrollment,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-Original PCF Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-Voluntary dismissal of PCF Complaint as to Dr. Bakeer,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4-Refiling PCF Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5-PCF Notice of Filing Fee Due,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6-PCF Notice of Dismissal for Failure to Pay Filing Fee
22 22 respm Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 04/24 8:58 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by St Francis Medical Center.(aty,Hains, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice
Thursday, April 10, 2025
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/11 9:02 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mohammad Aly Bakeer, St Francis Medical Center filed by Kelvin Stallion.(crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 04/10 4:48 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting17 Motion to Amend/Correct. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 4/24/25 St Francis Medical Center is permitted to file a supplemental memo in support of its pending10 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the19 Notice of Motion Setting is VACATED. No later than 4/24/25, Dr Bakeer is permitted to file a supplemental memo in support of his Motion to Dismiss. Stallion's opposition to Dr. Bakeer's Motion to Dismiss must be filed no later than 5/15/25. Finally, Dr. Bakeer's reply memorandum, if any, must be filed within 7 days of the date Stallion's opposition is filed. See pdf for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 4/10/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/10 4:55 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Supplemental Memorandum/Sur-Replies due by 4/24/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/10 4:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to18 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dr. Mohammad Aly Bakeer MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Supplemental Memorandum due by 4/24/2025. Response due by 5/15/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Motion Setting Wed 04/09 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:18 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dr. Mohammad Aly Bakeer MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 4/30/2025 (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 04/08 3:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Dr. Mohammad Aly Bakeer, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mohammad Aly Bakeer. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky.(Attorney Fred W Sartor, Jr added to party Mohammad Aly Bakeer(pty:dft))(aty,Sartor, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Fri 04/04 11:07 AM
MOTION to File Amended Complaint by Kelvin Stallion. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/4/2025.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed pleading,
Att: 2 Proposed exhibit
Thursday, April 03, 2025
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/03 9:33 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by St Francis Medical Center. (aty,Hains, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
15 15 misc Exhibit Wed 04/02 3:00 PM
EXHIBITS re14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Kelvin Stallion. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/31 2:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kelvin Stallion.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, March 21, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 4:13 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying8 Motion for the Court to Conduct an Investigation into the Validity of the Registered Agents Identity for SFMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/21/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 4:09 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying7 Motion for Relief from Medical Review Panel Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/21/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Motion Setting Fri 03/21 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 4/11/2025 (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 03/21 2:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by St Francis Medical Center. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky.(Attorney Alexandra Cobb Hains added to party St Francis Medical Center(pty:dft))(aty,Hains, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Petition for Damages,
Att: 3 Proposed order
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/10 4:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed St Francis Medical Center served on 2/28/2025, answer due 3/21/2025. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/03 1:20 PM
MOTION for the Court to conduct an investigation into the Validity of the Registered Agents Identity for SFMC by Kelvin Stallion. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/3/2025.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/26 1:55 PM
MOTION for Relief from Medical Review Panel Fees Due to IFP Status by Kelvin Stallion. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/26/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Wed 02/19 8:34 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mohammad Aly Bakeer, St Francis Medical Center. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/13 4:38 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Service by U S Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/13/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM285 Form
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/13 4:34 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/13/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/11 3:34 PM
MOTION for Service by U S Marshal by Kelvin Stallion. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/11/2025. (crt,Miletello, A) (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/11/2025) 285 Forms
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/11 3:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelvin Stallion. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/11/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Mohammad Aly Bakeer, St Francis Medical Center with Jury Demand filed by Kelvin Stallion.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/12 2:33 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]