New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Case #: 1:25-cv-01235
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:22 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corp.
Defendant
Jacob Fernane
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-3
Defendant
Liqueous LP
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pacific Lion LLC
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Merida Capital Partners III LP
Represented By
Taeler K. Lanser
Kleinberg Kaplan Wolff & Cohen PC
contact info
Joshua Kallman Bromberg
Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
43 43 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/05 8:23 PM
DECLARATION of Joshua K. Bromberg in Opposition re:29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration AND . MOTION to Dismiss THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, (II) . MOTION to Transfer Case TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA TO RULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND . MOTION to Stay THIS ACTION .. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit BREX04416,
Att: 2 Exhibit Miami-Dade Criminal Case Search Results,
Att: 3 Exhibit Fernane Arrest Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit Fernane Level 2 Release Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit Fernane Second Amended Order for Modification of Pretrial Release,
Att: 6 Exhibit Mid-Castle ECF No 89,
Att: 7 Exhibit Mid-Castle ECF No 50,
Att: 8 Exhibit Mid-Castle ECF No 69,
Att: 9 Exhibit Mid-Castle ECF No 42,
Att: 10 Exhibit Avantgarde ECF No 34,
Att: 11 Exhibit Avantgarde ECF No 33,
Att: 12 Exhibit Mid-Castle ECF No 75,
Att: 13 Exhibit Mid-Castle ECF No 85
42 42 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/05 8:18 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration AND . MOTION to Dismiss THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, (II) . MOTION to Transfer Case TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA TO RULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND . MOTION to Stay THIS ACTION . . Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/02 5:40 PM
LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated May 2, 2025 re:35 LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated April 22, 2025. . Document filed by Jacob Fernane, Liqueous LP, Pacific Lion LLC..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
40 40 respm Response to Motion Thu 05/01 6:37 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Joshua K. Bromberg dated May 1, 2025 re:36 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Quash Ten Third Party Subpoenas addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated April 24, 2025. . Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
39 39 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/29 6:09 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Joshua K. Bromberg dated April 29, 2025 re:35 LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated April 22, 2025. . Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit SIX Response to Merida Subpoena,
Att: 2 Exhibit BREX04416,
Att: 3 Exhibit BREX00219,
Att: 4 Exhibit BREX04360,
Att: 5 Exhibit Miami-Dade Criminal Case Search Results,
Att: 6 Exhibit Fernane Arrest Affidavit,
Att: 7 Exhibit Fernane Level 2 Release Order,
Att: 8 Exhibit Fernane Second Amended Order for Mod. of Pretrial Release
Friday, April 25, 2025
38 38 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 04/25 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/15/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Transcript Fri 04/25 4:48 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/15/2025 before Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/16/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
36 36 motion Discovery Thu 04/24 7:12 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery Quash Ten Third Party Subpoenas addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated April 24, 2025. Document filed by Jacob Fernane, Liqueous LP, Pacific Lion LLC..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena - Velocity Clearing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Subpoena - Charles Schwab & Co.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Subpoena - Interactive Brokers,
Att: 4 Exhibit Subpoena - Jeffries LLC,
Att: 5 Exhibit Subpoena -Merrill Lynch,
Att: 6 Exhibit Subpoena - National Financial,
Att: 7 Exhibit Subpoena - RBC Capital,
Att: 8 Exhibit Subpoena - Tastytrade,
Att: 9 Exhibit Subpoena - TD Ameritrade,
Att: 10 Exhibit Subpoena - UBS Financial
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
35 35 motion Stay Tue 04/22 8:32 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated April 22, 2025. Document filed by Jacob Fernane, Liqueous LP, Pacific Lion LLC..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
34 34 misc Letter Thu 04/17 3:19 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Taeler K. Lanser dated April 17, 2025 re: Amending Complaint. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Lanser, Taeler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
33 33 order Case Management Plan Wed 04/16 10:17 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All patties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2025. Expert Discovery due by 1/15/2026. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their best estimate of the length of trial is 4 days. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 4/15/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/16 10:09 AM
ORDER: On April 15, 2025, the parties appeared for an initial pretrial conference with the Court. ECF No. 14. As stated at the conference, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants may file a letter motion to stay discovery by April 22, 2025. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion shall be due by April 29, 2025. Defendants' reply papers shall be due by May 2, 2025. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF No. 29, shall be due by May 5, 2025. Defendants' reply papers shall be due by May 12, 2025. ( Motions due by 4/22/2025., Responses due by 5/5/2025, Replies due by 5/12/2025.) (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 4/15/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
31 31 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 04/08 4:23 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Letter Tue 04/08 4:21 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Joshua K. Bromberg and Robert G. Heim dated April 8, 2025 Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
29 29 motion Compel Arbitration Dismiss Transfer Case Stay Mon 04/07 7:32 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration AND ., MOTION to Dismiss THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, (II) ., MOTION to Transfer Case TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA TO RULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND ., MOTION to Stay THIS ACTION . Document filed by Jacob Fernane, Liqueous LP, Pacific Lion LLC..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION,
Att: 2 Affidavit DECLARATION OF RICHARD HAWKINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS JACOB FERNANE, PACFIC LION LLC AND LIQUEOUS LPS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - AGREEMENT (Beneficial Ownership Retention Repurchase Option),
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - AMENDMENT (Stock Repurchase Agreement Amendment)
Monday, March 24, 2025
28 28 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/24 4:35 PM
JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT JACOB FERNANE'S RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants that Mr. Fernane will respond to the Complaint (ECF Nos. 1, 11), along with Defendants Pacific Lion and Liqueous, by no later than April 7, 2025. SO ORDERED. Jacob Fernane answer due 4/7/2025. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 3/24/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/24 2:20 PM
ORDER denying24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. A party seeking a stay of discovery shall file a letter-motion pursuant to this Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. Any such letter-motion will be discussed at the upcoming conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas)(Text Only Order) (Yin-Olowu, Tammy)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/24 2:08 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Joshua K. Bromberg dated March 24, 2025 re:24 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated March 20, 2025. . Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
25 25 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 03/21 8:33 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jacob Fernane, Liqueous LP, Pacific Lion LLC..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/20 11:06 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated March 20, 2025. Document filed by Jacob Fernane, Liqueous LP, Pacific Lion LLC..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 10:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Gerard Heim on behalf of Jacob Fernane..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Letter Thu 03/20 6:10 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Joshua K. Bromberg dated March 20, 2025 re: Withdrawal of Request for Service by Alternative Means (ECF No. 20). Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/11 10:17 AM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Pacific Lion LLC and Liqueous LP's request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Defendants' response shall be filed by no later than April 7, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas)(Text Only Order) (Yin-Olowu, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Fri 03/07 3:28 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Joshua K. Bromberg dated March 7, 2025 re: Request for alternative service for Defendant Jacob Fernane. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs misc Letter Fri 03/07 1:39 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Joshua K. Bromberg dated March 7, 2025 re: Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Dkt. 18). Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
18 18 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/06 9:29 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:11 Complaint addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Robert Heim dated March 6, 2025. Document filed by Pacific Lion LLC, Liqueous LP..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 9:06 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pacific Lion LLC, Liqueous LP..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 6:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Gerard Heim on behalf of Pacific Lion LLC, Liqueous LP..(Heim, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 03/06 6:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Pretrial Conference and Individual Rules and Practices served on Robert G. Heim on 3/6/2025. Service was accepted by Robert G. Heim. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 02/26 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 15, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 14C, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 2/26/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 02/19 10:00 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Pacific Lion LLC served on 2/14/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. Service was accepted by Russell Clarke. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 02/14 4:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Liqueous LP served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. Service was accepted by Alyssa Daniel's. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
11 11 36 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/12 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT against ABC Corp., Jacob Fernane, John Does 1-3, Liqueous LP, Pacific Lion LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30605640)Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 02/12 9:59 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pacific Lion LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 02/12 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liqueous LP. (vf)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 02/12 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob Fernane. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 02/12 9:42 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Kallman Bromberg to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 02/12 9:43 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Kallman Bromberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331sv Fed. Question: Securities Violation; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act; the County code has been modified to Westchester. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 02/12 9:45 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 02/12 9:45 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 02/12 9:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 6:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taeler K. Lanser on behalf of Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Lanser, Taeler)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/11 6:32 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/11 5:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pacific Lion LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/11 5:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liqueous LP, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/11 5:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacob Fernane, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/11 5:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 5:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30602987)Document filed by Merida Capital Partners III LP..(Bromberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]