Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:25-cv-00189
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Hunter Porter
James Miller, Law Office of Tammi Enochs 200 Concord Plaza Drive, Suite 650
San Antonio, TX 78216
Defendant
Singh Sukhraj Thind
John M. Jack Sigman, Lynn Castagna, Castagna Scott 1120 S. Capital of Texas Highway Building 2, Suite 300
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Lynn S. Castagna
Castagna Scott LLP
contact info
John M. Sigman
Castagna Scott
contact info
Defendant
1137254 Ontario LTD
Represented By
Lynn S. Castagna
Castagna Scott LLP
contact info
John M. Sigman
Castagna Scott
contact info
Plaintiff
Domonick McKinex
Charles Dunn, DJC LAW, PLLC 1012 W. Anderson Ln
Austin, TX 78757
Represented By
Charles S. Dunn
Djc Law, PLLC
contact info
Mark David Pierce
Dc Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
6 6 notice Amended Notice of Removal Wed 02/26 5:44 PM
Amended NOTICE of Removal by Singh Sukhraj Thind, 1137254 Ontario LTD re1 Notice of Removal,, & Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand , filed by Singh Sukhraj Thind, 1137254 Ontario LTD.(Sigman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix with Exhibits
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
5 5 motion Remand to State Court Wed 02/12 4:55 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Domonick McKinex. (Pierce, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/12 1:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1137254 Ontario LTD, Singh Sukhraj Thind alternate means of service to counsel (Sigman, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 11:04 AM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Deficiency Notice Wed 02/12 11:04 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal: Your Certificate of Service indicates ECF service on attorney for Plaintiff, who had not been added to the docket at the time of filing the Notice of Removal, and therefore had not been served via CM/ECF. Please file an Amended Certificate of Service as a SEPARATE PLEADING. Use the "Certificate of Service" event under the "Service of Process" menu. State alternate means of service to counsel. (kp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/11 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Singh Sukhraj Thind, Virdi Trucking Co 1137254 Ontario LTD d/b/a (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19780062), filed by Singh Sukhraj Thind, Virdi Trucking Co 1137254 Ontario LTD d/b/a.(Sigman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Files,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1 of 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2 of 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3 of 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 4 of 4
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/12 11:02 AM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 02/12 11:02 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 02/12 11:03 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Domonick McKinex, Singh Sukhraj Thind. (kp)
Related: [-]