Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:R Austin Huffaker, Jr
Referred: Stephen Michael Doyle
Case #: 3:25-cv-00115
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Real Property
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 4:50 AM CDT
Defendant
Donna Rice
as personal representative of the ESTATE OF ROBERT L. GOLDEN 471 Dead Timbers Road
Dadeville, AL 36853
Represented By
Rhonda Steadman Hood
Hood Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Allen Bottcher
Mcglinchey Stafford
contact info
Bailee Taunton Curtis
Mcglinchey Stafford
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 05/01 2:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that the Plf shall SHOW CAUSE on or before May 15, 2025, with citations to law and fact, as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Dft shall file a response on or before May 29, 2025. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 5/1/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/01 2:13 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2026 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr.; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2026; Non-Jury Trial set for 10/14/2026 at 10:00 AM in Opelika, AL before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr.; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 2/16/2026; Mediation Notice due by 1/16/2026; Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2025 for the plf and by 6/30/2025 for the dft; Discovery due by 12/30/2025, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 5/1/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 minutes Status Conference Mon 04/28 1:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr.: Status Conference held on 4/28/2025 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Dee Coker, 334.799.1573, dee_coker@almd.uscourts.gov) (WW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
20 20 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/22 2:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Participate in Scheduling Conference via Telephone or Video Conference or, in the Alternative, to Re-schedule the Conference. (Doc. 19 .) For good cause, the Motion (doc. 19 ) is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the status and scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2025 in Opelika will now take place by video conference call. The Courtroom Deputy will contact counsel with the call-in information. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 4/22/2025. (term hearing: Status & Scheduling Conference set for 04/28/2025 in Opelika, AL)(BES)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appear Tue 04/22 11:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Telephone or Videoconference or, in the Alternative, to Reschedule the Hearing by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Bottcher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 04/22 11:22 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bottcher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 11:46 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donna Rice. (Hood, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/01 10:38 AM
ORDER: This matter is SET for an in-person scheduling and status conference at 1:30 p.m. on April 28, 2025, in Opelika, Alabama; it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) Report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/22/2025. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 4/1/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 11:59 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Donna Rice. (Hood, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/25 2:59 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Dft's deadline to respond to the Summons and Complaint is EXTENDED up to and including March 31, 2025. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 3/25/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Tue 03/25 12:15 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Donna Rice; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/4/2025.(BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/25 11:56 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Donna Rice. (Hood, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 5:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Steadman Hood on behalf of Donna Rice (Hood, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/20 1:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Alias Summons and Complaint served on Donna Rice on 2/18/25, filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Bottcher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 2:10 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC re4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bottcher, Christopher) Modified on 2/13/2025 to add link(BES)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Alias Summons Thu 02/13 10:14 AM
Alias Summons issued as to Donna Rice. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Alias Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (BES)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Proposed Summons Thu 02/13 9:58 AM
Proposed Summons (corrected) (Bottcher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 02/12 10:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Donna Rice. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (BES)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons Wed 02/12 8:39 AM
Proposed Summons Donna W. Rice (Bottcher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Tue 02/11 4:33 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/21/2025.(BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel Tue 02/11 4:31 PM
NOTICE to Counsel re Service Material. (BES)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/11 4:26 PM
Case assigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge. (BES)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Donna Rice ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3800391.), filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 5/12/2025. (Bottcher, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/11/2025 to remove ability to edit PDF) (BES). Modified on 2/11/2025 to correct named dft (BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit