Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:25-cv-00282
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 4:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Nohayia Javed
Defendant
West Town Bank & Trust
Plaintiff
Charm Hospitality LLC
Represented By
Aj Kung
Kung & Brown
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
23 23 misc Appendix Thu 05/08 7:35 PM
APPENDIX re: Charm's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss & Counter Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to21 Response,22 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Charm Hospitality LLC. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Motion Summary Judgment Thu 05/08 7:34 PM
Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment re21 Response,17 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Charm Hospitality LLC. Responses due by 5/29/2025.(Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Jagmohan Dhillon
21 21 respm Response Thu 05/08 7:30 PM
RESPONSE to17 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Charm Hospitality LLC. Replies due by 5/15/2025.(Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Jagmohan Dhillon
Friday, May 02, 2025
20 20 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 05/02 1:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nohayia Javed that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Briana Collings, Other Affiliate Robertson, Johnson, Miller and Williamson for Nohayia Javed added. (Brown, Lori)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
19 19 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 05/01 2:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by West Town Bank & Trust that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Capital Bancorp, Inc., Other Affiliate Capital Bank, N.A. for West Town Bank & Trust added. (Rulis, Nathanael)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc QC Notice Thu 05/01 9:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by West Town Bank & Trust. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/8/2025. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
17 17 motion Motion Dismiss Fri 04/25 4:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,, by Defendant Nohayia Javed. Responses due by 5/9/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/5/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/9/2025.(Brown, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
16 16 notice Notice Other Tue 04/22 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Intent to Default Against Defendant, Nohayia Javed, Esq. by Charm Hospitality LLC re1 Complaint,,. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/21 2:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by West Town Bank & Trust. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/1/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/5/2025.(Rulis, Nathanael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
14 14 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Mon 04/14 3:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/14/2025. The Court DENIES12 Joint Motion to Extend Time. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b) and Local Rule 26-3, a motion to extend any date set by a court order must be supported by a showing of good cause. Defendants argue that good cause exists because the motion to enforce settlement in the underlying litigation is pending and this instant action necessarily relies on the outcome of that motion. ECF No. 12 at 2. This Court disagrees. Based on the allegations in Plaintiff's complaint, this case does not necessarily rely on the underlying motion. For this reason, Defendants' motion is not supported by good cause. However, as a one-time courtesy, this Court will give Defendants a one-week extension to file a responsive pleading. Answers due by 4/21/2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BCI)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
13 13 misc Errata Fri 04/11 1:55 PM
ERRATA to12 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendant West Town Bank & Trust. (Rulis, Nathanael)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 04/11 12:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading re1 Complaint,, by Defendant West Town Bank & Trust. Responses due by 4/25/2025. (Rulis, Nathanael) (answer)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/17 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charm Hospitality LLC re3 Summons Issued. Nohayia Javed waiver sent on 2/12/2025, answer due 4/13/2025. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/05 12:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charm Hospitality LLC re3 Summons Issued. Charm Hospitality LLC waiver sent on 2/12/2025, answer due 4/13/2025. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response Wed 03/05 12:49 PM
RESPONSE to4 Order,, by Plaintiff Charm Hospitality LLC. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassign Judge Fri 02/21 2:31 PM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:25-cv-00282-RFB-BNW. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/20/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
7 7 notice Notice Related Cases Wed 02/19 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:23-cv-00228-RFB-BNW by Plaintiff Charm Hospitality LLC. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 02/19 11:57 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Charm Hospitality LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
5 5 order Standing Order Tue 02/18 9:13 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/14 9:05 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that by March 7, 2025, plaintiff Charm Hospitality LLC shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond to this order by that date will result in dismissal of the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Charm Hospitality LLC's 2 certificate of interested parties is stricken. Charm must file a proper certificate of interested parties by March 7, 2025. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/14/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 11:25 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nohayia Javed, West Town Bank & Trust re1 Complaint. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 02/12 4:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Charm Hospitality LLC dba Wingate by Wyndham Elko that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
1 1 78 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Charm Hospitality LLC dba Wingate by Wyndham Elko (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7953256) by Charm Hospitality LLC dba Wingate by Wyndham Elko. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/21/2025. Proof of service due by 5/12/2025. (Kung, Aj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Javed,
Att: 3 Summons WTB
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 02/13 11:13 AM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ALZ)
Related: [-]