Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:25-bk-30515
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Multiband Field Services, Inc.
2801 Network Blvd Ste 300
Frisco, TX 75034-1881
Represented By
Conor White
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
36 36 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/30 2:43 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MOR Attachment
Monday, April 21, 2025
35 35 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 8:11 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
34 34 29 pgs misc Schedules Wed 04/16 1:45 PM
Amended Schedules: D, E-F, (Changing the classification of a debt) fee Amount $34 (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/16 1:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Schedules([LINK 25-30515 mvl11] ) [misc,schedall] ( 34.00). Receipt number A32426925, amount $ 34.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#34
court Meeting of creditors held Wed 04/16 3:43 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 4/16/2025 Related [+] (Kippes, Meredyth)
Related: [-] Meeting of creditors continued/adjourned
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 04/15 3:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Scott M. Seidel filed by Attorney Seidel Law Firm. (Seidel, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
32 32 court Transcript Mon 04/14 4:06 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/1/2025 RE: HEARING ON MOTION TO APPOINT TRUSTEE FILED BY DEBTOR MULTIBAND FIELD SERVICES, INC. (9). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/14/2025. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dipti Patel/Liberty Transcripts, Telephone number (847) 848-4907. Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/14/2025. (Patel, Dipti)
Related: [-] 23 Hearing held on 4/1/2025. (RE: related document(s)9 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List)) (Counsel appeared for Scott Seidel, the Chapter 7 Trustee of the Debtors parent Goodman Networks, UMB, NA, Indenture Trustee, and the Office of the United States Trustee. For the reasons set forth on the record, Motion DENIED without prejudice. Debtors counsel shall file an employment application within 30 days hereof.)
31 31 court Transcript Mon 04/14 4:05 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 3/20/2025 RE: HEARING ON MOTION TO APPOINT TRUSTEE FILED BY DEBTOR MULTIBAND FIELD SERVICES, INC. (8). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/14/2025. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dipti Patel/Liberty Transcripts, Telephone number (847) 848-4907. Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/14/2025. (Patel, Dipti)
Related: [-] 20 Hearing held on 3/20/2025. (RE: related document(s)9 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List)) (Counsel appeared for Scott Seidel, the Chapter 7 Trustee of the Debtors parent Goodman Networks, UMB, NA, Indenture Trustee, and the Office of the United States Trustee. Court continued hearing to be reset at the parties convenience to further discuss potential for conflicts, best way to resolve same and whether the appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee is in the best interest of the estate. To the extent Debtors counsel later needs to file an employment application, Court will grant nunc pro tunc status to Petition Date.)
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
30 30 misc Certificate of service Tue 04/08 5:31 PM
Certificate of service re: filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Jaksa, James)
Related: [-] 21 Notice (generic)
29 29 notice Notice of hearing Tue 04/08 4:04 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 5/8/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/larson for28 , (Jaksa, James)
Related: [-] 28 Application to employ Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Attorney Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
28 28 19 pgs motion Employ Tue 04/08 3:40 PM
Application to employ Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Attorney Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Jaksa, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, April 03, 2025
27 27 order Appoint trustee Thu 04/03 4:23 PM
Order denying motion to appoint trustee. Related [+] Entered on 4/3/2025. (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-] 9
26 26 misc Request for transcript Thu 04/03 12:48 PM
Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 4/1/2025. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (Berghman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Request for transcript Thu 04/03 11:08 AM
Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 3/26/2025. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (Berghman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Request for transcript Thu 04/03 11:07 AM
Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 3/20/2025. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (Berghman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
23 23 court Hearing held Thu 04/03 10:54 AM
Hearing held on 4/1/2025. Related [+] (Counsel appeared for Scott Seidel, the Chapter 7 Trustee of the Debtors parent Goodman Networks, UMB, NA, Indenture Trustee, and the Office of the United States Trustee. For the reasons set forth on the record, Motion DENIED without prejudice. Debtors counsel shall file an employment application within 30 days hereof.) (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List)
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of hearing Wed 03/26 10:06 AM
Notice of hearing - Continued Hearing on Motion to Appoint Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 4/1/2025 at 02:00 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/larson for9 , (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List)
Att: 1 WebEx Hearing Instructions
Att: 2 Service List
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (generic) Tue 03/25 3:43 PM
Notice of Continued 341 Meeting filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Debtor to serve notice of continued meeting on matrix. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/16/2025 at 03:00 PM by TELEPHONE.
Att: 1 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case
Att: 2 Service List
Monday, March 24, 2025
trustee Meeting of creditors continued/adjourned Mon 03/24 4:36 PM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Debtor to serve notice of continued meeting on matrix. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/16/2025 at 03:00 PM by TELEPHONE. (Kippes, Meredyth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
20 20 court Hearing held Thu 03/20 2:50 PM
Hearing held on 3/20/2025. Related [+] (Counsel appeared for Scott Seidel, the Chapter 7 Trustee of the Debtors parent Goodman Networks, UMB, NA, Indenture Trustee, and the Office of the United States Trustee. Court continued hearing to be reset at the parties convenience to further discuss potential for conflicts, best way to resolve same and whether the appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee is in the best interest of the estate. To the extent Debtors counsel later needs to file an employment application, Court will grant nunc pro tunc status to Petition Date.) (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List)
19 19 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 03/20 9:11 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Philip Michael Guffy filed by Creditor UMB Bank, National Association. (Guffy, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 3 pgs misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Mon 03/17 4:01 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to appoint trustee
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A
Friday, March 14, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 03/14 4:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen R. Butler Filed by Creditor TN Dept of Revenue. (Butler, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
16 16 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sun 02/23 11:33 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/24/2025 at 02:30 PM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 6/23/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/11/2025.
Saturday, February 22, 2025
15 15 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 02/23 11:28 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 130. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order reassigning case - Judge Scott W Everett terminated. Judge Michelle V. Larson assigned. (Re: document(s)5 Ex Parte Motion to transfer case to Dallas divisional office Motion for Intra-Division Reassignment filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.) Entered on 2/20/2025 (Ecker, C.). Modified to create linkage on 2/21/2025 .
Friday, February 21, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 02/21 12:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Courtney Jane Hull filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division. (Hull, Courtney)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of service Fri 02/21 8:53 AM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Att: 1 Service List
Thursday, February 20, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of hearing Thu 02/20 5:54 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 3/20/2025 at 09:30 AM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm for9 , (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List)
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Judge Larson's webex instructions
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Service list
11 11 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 02/20 11:40 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/24/2025 at 02:30 PM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 6/23/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/11/2025. (Nixon, Sandra)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Reassigning case Thu 02/20 11:00 AM
Order reassigning case - Judge Scott W Everett terminated. Judge Michelle V. Larson assigned. Entered on 2/20/2025 (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
9 9 motion Appoint trustee Tue 02/18 2:12 PM
Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (Rukavina, Davor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service List
Friday, February 14, 2025
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing Fri 02/14 11:16 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency. Creditor matrix due 2/14/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 2/14/2025.
7 7 4 pgs misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Fri 02/14 3:52 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
6 6 8 pgs misc Matrix Fri 02/14 1:24 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. Related [+]. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 motion Transfer case within district (intra-district) Thu 02/13 1:28 PM
Ex Parte Motion to transfer case to Dallas divisional office Motion for Intra-Division Reassignment Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc. (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 court Notice of deficiency Wed 02/12 10:21 AM
Notice of deficiency. Creditor matrix due 2/14/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 2/14/2025. (Billings, Emma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
3 3 8 pgs misc Statement of financial affairs Tue 02/11 6:03 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Schedules Tue 02/11 6:02 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Multiband Field Services, Inc.. (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Tue 02/11 5:52 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Multiband Field Services, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/11/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 06/11/2025. (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 02/11 5:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 25-30515 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A32235112, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1