Utah District Court
Judge:Dale A Kimball
Referred: Dustin B Pead
Case #: 2:25-cv-00102
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 4:42 AM MDT
Defendant
Jess L. Anderson
Defendant
Derek Brown
Defendant
Spencer J. Cox
Defendant
Mike Schultz
Defendant
State of Utah
Defendant
J. Adams Stuart
Defendant
Utah Administrative Office of the Courts
Defendant
Utah Attorney General's Office
Defendant
Utah County Attorney's Office
Defendant
Utah Department of Public Safety
Defendant
Utah House of Representatives
Defendant
Utah Judicial Council
Defendant
Utah State Senate
Plaintiff
David Ammon Jakeman
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 57 N ARCHMORE ST
SARATOGA SPRINGS, UT 84043

GPO Feb 26 2025
ORDER denying 4 Motion to Expedite Complaint; and denying 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/26/2025. (eat)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 motion Expedite Wed 04/23 10:02 AM
Plaintiff's Second MOTION to Expedite filed by Plaintiff David Ammon Jakeman. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. (eat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum Decision Wed 02/26 11:44 AM
ORDER denying 4 Motion to Expedite Complaint; and denying 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/26/2025. (eat)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/24 12:21 PM
ORDER temporarily granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will screen the complaint. Plaintiff may complete and return forms provided by the court. Other than court forms, Plaintiff must not file any additional motions or other documents during the time the case is screened. The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court. If the action is allowed to proceed, the court will order service of process on the Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/24/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Tue 02/18 4:47 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff David Ammon Jakeman. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. (eat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/12 9:54 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate Judge to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/12/2025. (eat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Email Filing and Notification Form Tue 02/11 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by David Ammon Jakeman (kec)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Expedite Tue 02/11 4:30 PM
MOTION to Expedite Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Ammon Jakeman. (kec)
Related: [-]
3 3 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum (NOT to motion) Tue 02/11 4:28 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT re1 Complaint filed by David Ammon Jakeman. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/11 4:25 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff David Ammon Jakeman. (kec)
Related: [-] ceived by the court on: 2/11/2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Court) Tue 02/11 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Jess L. Anderson, Derek Brown, Spencer J. Cox, Mike Schultz, State of Utah, J. Adams Stuart, Utah Administrative Office of the Courts, Utah Attorney General's Office, Utah County Attorney's Office, Utah Department of Public Safety, Utah House of Representatives, Utah Judicial Council, Utah State Senate (Originally received by the court on 2/11/2025). (Fee Status: In Forma Pauperis) filed by David Ammon Jakeman. Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (kec)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet