Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-10391
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Angel Gutierrez
Defendant
Paul Long
Plaintiff
Dana McAllister
607 Shelby Street No. 700-749
Detroit, MI 48226
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Melissa Long
Terminated: 02/24/2025

GPO Feb 24 2025
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND PARTIALLY DISMISSING CLAIMS AND DEFENDANT MELISSA LONG Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/24/2025) (AFla).

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
20 20 service Summons Issued* Wed 04/23 3:57 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Paul Long* (TTho)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Default Judgment Wed 04/23 3:56 PM
MOTION for entry of Default Judgment by Dana McAllister [E-Filer]. (TTho)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Wed 04/23 1:53 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Having reviewed the Notice of Revised Address, ECF No. 13, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to process this case for service upon receipt of the appropriately revised documents for Defendant Paul Long; and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon Defendant Paul Long at the revised address provided without prepayment of the usual costs for such service. SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (JHea)
Related: [-]
service Service Documents Received Wed 04/23 3:49 PM
Service Documents Received - for Paul Long. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
18 18 order Clerks Entry of Default/Default Judgment - Denied* Thu 04/17 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default JUDGMENT as to *Angel Gutierrez*. Reason: *No defendant named on Request and the requested amount cannot be verified in accordance with LR 55.2.* (SSch)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default* Thu 04/17 3:02 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Angel Gutierrez* (SSch)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Se E-filing Access Given Thu 04/17 9:31 AM
Pro Se E-filing Access Given to Dana McAllister [E-Filer]. (JPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
16 16 petition Request for Clerks Entry of Judgment by Default Wed 04/16 3:55 PM
REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default by Dana McAllister [E-Filer]. [REQUEST DOES NOT SPECIFY AS TO WHICH DEFENDANT AND DOES NOT INCLUDE AN AFFIDAVIT OF SUM CERTAIN] (JHea)
Related: [-]
15 15 petition Request for Clerks Entry of Default Wed 04/16 3:53 PM
REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Angel Gutierrez by Dana McAllister [E-Filer]. (JHea)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Pro Se E-Filer Electronic Account Renewal Wed 04/16 3:52 PM
Pro Se E-filer Electronic Account Renewal Form submitted by Dana McAllister [E-Filer] (JPar)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice - Other Wed 04/16 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Revised Address for Paul Long by Dana McAllister [E-Filer]. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 service Acknowledgment Wed 04/02 2:45 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Angel Gutierrez, Paul Long. Documents personally served by USMS on 3/21/2025. [Unexecuted as to Paul Long. Incomplete Address, Need Apartment # Due to Being an Apartment Complex] (MSyl)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Correction Wed 04/02 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Correction re10 Acknowledgment. (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 service Acknowledgment Mon 03/31 3:55 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Angel Gutierrez. Documents personally served by USMS on 3/25/2025. (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued* Fri 03/07 4:26 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Angel Gutierrez* (CShr)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued* Fri 03/07 4:25 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Paul Long* (CShr)
Related: [-]
service Service Documents Received Mon 03/10 8:28 AM
Service Documents Received (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Mon 02/24 12:50 PM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Directing Service by the US Marshal Mon 02/24 12:49 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
5 5 10 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 02/24 12:46 PM
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND PARTIALLY DISMISSING CLAIMS AND DEFENDANT MELISSA LONG Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/24/2025) (AFla)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 02/24 12:52 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Memorandum Opinion & Order X3, Add and Terminate Parties,7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge,6 Directing Service by the US Marshal mailed to: Dana McAllister at 607 Shelby Street No. 700-749 Detroit, MI 48226 (AFla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 1 pgs notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Wed 02/12 4:59 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Tue 02/11 11:03 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Dana McAllister. (CShr)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 02/11 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Dana McAllister against All Defendants (CShr)
Related: [-]