Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:25-cv-00448
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:12 AM EDT
Petitioner
Donna Denison
4654 Chippendale Drive
Naples, FL 34112
Represented By
Paul A Fenn
Conti Fenn LLC
contact info
Benjamin J Campbell
Conti Fenn LLC
contact info
Respondent
Robert E. Horsey
14819 Sycamore Road
Laurel, DE 19956
Respondent
David W. Horsey
28213 Beaver Dam Branch Road
Laurel, DE 19956
Respondent
Horsey Denison Landscaping LLC

GPO May 02 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 13 Motion to Vacate Entry of Default; VACATED 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 5/2/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
15 15 order Order Fri 05/02 9:57 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42, and with the parties' consent (Case No. 25-448, ECF Nos. 1, 13), Case Nos. 24-1484 and 25-448 are consolidated, as the claims at issue in each case are based on common questions of law and fact. The lead case is designated as Case No. 24-1484 Filings shall hereafter be made only in Case No. 24-1484 Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 5/2/2025. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 6 pgs order Memorandum and Order Order on Motion to Vacate Fri 05/02 9:27 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting13 Motion to Vacate Entry of Default; VACATED9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 5/2/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Fri 05/02 10:02 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 1:24-cv-01484-JRR. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - Member Case Fri 05/02 10:06 AM
THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (1:24-cv-01484-JRR). (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 motion Vacate Tue 04/08 7:21 PM
MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default by David W. Horsey, Robert E. Horsey, Horsey Denison Landscaping LLC(Brown, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Answer,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Default Tue 03/25 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to David W. Horsey (cm 3/25/25) (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Default Tue 03/25 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Robert E. Horsey (cm 3/25/25) (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Default Tue 03/25 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Horsey Denison Landscaping LLC (cm 3/25/25) (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 03/25 2:16 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to David W. Horsey, Robert E. Horsey, Horsey Denison Landscaping LLC (cm 3/25/25) (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Default - Clerk's Entry of Tue 03/25 12:10 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Donna Denison(Campbell, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/13 8:38 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Respond at ECF No. 6, it is this 12th day of March 2025, ORDERED that the Stipulation shall be, and is hereby, APPROVED; and further it is ORDERED that Respondents shall respond to the Petition at ECF No. 1 on or before March 24, 2025. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 3/12/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 03/12 2:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint,, Petition for Confirmation of "Arbitration" Award by Donna Denison(Campbell, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 8:35 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to David W. Horsey, Robert E. Horsey, Horsey Denison Landscaping LLC.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/12 12:47 PM
NOTICE by Donna Denison re1 Complaint,, Submitting Summonses(Campbell, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons for David Horsey,
Att: 2 Summons Summons for Robert Horsey
3 3 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 02/12 10:48 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by Donna Denison was filed incompletely. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons for named defendants. To correct this problem, file Summons for named defendants using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons for named defendants to 1 . (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 02/12 10:44 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by Donna Denison was filed incorrectly. **Not all pdf documents were flattened prior to filing. All pdfs uploaded to CM/ECF MUST BE FLATTENED for all future filings. Failure to comply may result in rejected filings and delays in case processing. **This filing has been corrected by court staff and no further corrective action is required. (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/12 10:33 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 8:12 PM
COMPLAINT of Petition for Confirmation of "Arbitration" Award against David W. Horsey, Robert E. Horsey, Horsey Denison Landscaping, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11778934.), filed by Donna Denison.(Campbell, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet